Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12819
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 7:19 AM EDT
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Yombor
Kaufman Dolowich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Teniah Brown
19405 Kingsville St
Harper Woods, MI 48225


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 order Dismissing Case Fri 04/04 5:02 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 notice Notice - Other Wed 02/26 2:11 PM
NOTICE by MRS BPO, LLC - JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Yombor, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 02/25 4:25 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to MRS BPO, LLC. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 01/30 1:01 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 01/30 1:04 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Teniah Brown at 19405 Kingsville St Harper Woods, MI 48225 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
9 9 service Acknowledgment Tue 01/07 1:04 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for MRS BPO, LLC. Documents mailed by USMS on 1/7/2025. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued* Mon 12/30 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *MRS BPO, LLC* (DPer)
Related: [-]
service Service Documents Received Mon 12/30 3:49 PM
Service Documents Received (LGra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Mon 12/23 10:25 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 12/23 10:29 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Teniah Brown at 19405 Kingsville St Harper Woods, MI 48225 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 11:10 AM
ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOLS ON FILINGS AND COMMUNICATION WITH THE COURT - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 12/06 10:28 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 10:32 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Teniah Brown at 19405 Kingsville St Harper Woods, MI 48225 (CCie)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 12/06 11:13 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order on Teniah Brown at 19405 Kingsville St Harper Woods, MI 48225 (CCie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 10/28 9:50 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 10/25 11:15 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Teniah Brown. [Pro Se Upload] (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 10/25 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Teniah Brown against MRS BPO, LLC[Pro Se Upload] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Coversheet