Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00202
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of Fayette County, 2024V-0897
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
ASI Home Insurance Corp.
Represented By
Victoria Elizabeth Munian
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, Llp-Atl
contact info
Seth M. Friedman
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric D Shemwell
Represented By
Brian Braddy
Your Insurance Attorney, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/05 2:13 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 10/3/2025. All deadlines in the Local Rules calculated from the end of discovery shall now be calculated from 10/03/2025. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 05/05/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/01 1:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Discovery by ASI Home Insurance Corp..(Munian, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ASI Home Insurance Corp. Response and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production, Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Verification of Vickie L. Ryan (Munian, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/17 2:08 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Dismiss Count III for attorney's fees of Shemwell's complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 04/17/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Fri 03/28 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Filing Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by ASI Home Insurance Corp.(Munian, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 3 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 12:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASI Home Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corp. for ASI Home Insurance Corp.. (Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/28 7:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ASI Home Insurance Corp. Defendant ASI Home Insurance Corp.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff and Defendant ASI Home Insurance Corp.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by ASI Home Insurance Corp. Defendant ASI Home Insurance Corp.'s Initial Disclosures (Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 1:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 8/1/2025. Motions due by 9/1/2025. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/5/2025. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 9 pgs misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 01/31 2:06 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ASI Home Insurance Corp.. (Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Fri 01/17 2:52 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 04/03/25, 04/04/25, 04/07/25, 04/08/25, 04/09/25, 04/10/25, 04/11/25, 04/14/25, 12/12/25, 12/15/25, 12/16/25, 12/22/25, 12/23/25, 12/24/25, 12/25/25, 12/26/25, by Seth M. Friedman. (Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
5 5 5 pgs discov Initial Disclosures Fri 12/13 9:25 AM
Initial Disclosures by Eric D Shemwell.(Braddy, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/04 3:45 PM
INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/04/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 11/20 11:10 AM
Submission of3 First MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Fri 11/01 4:36 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by ASI Home Insurance Corp..(Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief ISO of Partial MTD Count III
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 11/01 4:29 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Complaint by ASI Home Insurance Corp.. Discovery ends on 3/31/2025.(Friedman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 10/25 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ASI Home Insurance Corp. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13818007)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet