South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 8:24-cv-06078
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Patrick Square LLC
Represented By
Ryan Lee Beaver
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings (cha Nc)
contact info
Defendant
H&H Concrete LLC
Represented By
Lisa A Reynolds
Reynolds And Stephens LLC
contact info
Defendant
H&R Drywall Inc
Defendant
Harbin Lumber Company Inc
Represented By
G Troy Thames
Willson Jones Carter And Baxley (mt Plea)
contact info
Defendant
International Construction Services Inc
Defendant
JMC Communities Inc
Represented By
Ryan Lee Beaver
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings (cha Nc)
contact info
Defendant
JMC Homes of South Carolina LLC
Represented By
Ryan Lee Beaver
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings (cha Nc)
contact info
Defendant
Maria Construction Inc
Defendant
Palmetto Grading and Drainage Inc
Represented By
Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Defendant
84 Lumber Company LP
Represented By
Jared Hudson Garraux
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info
Defendant
RC Johnson LLC
Defendant
Riverside Landscaping LLC
Defendant
Solid Rock Construction Services LLC
Represented By
Robert Lindsay Mebane, Jr
Mcangus Goudelock And Courie Llc (gre)
contact info
Madelyn E. Dukes
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Soto HVAC LLC
Defendant
Tiny Bill Swaney
Defendant
UFP Mid-Atlantic LLC
Represented By
James A Bruorton, IV
Rosen Hagood (cha)
contact info
Timothy J.W. Muller
Rosen Hagood (cha)
contact info
Defendant
Willow Tree Landscaping Inc
Defendant
Gunter Heating & Air Conditioning of SC LLC
Represented By
Robert Curtis Gunst, Jr.
Wolfe Campbell Gunst And Hinson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gorze Inc
Defendant
Gentry Services LLC
Defendant
Five Star Construction Inc
Represented By
Sonaly Kirkley Hendricks
Pierce Herns Sloan And Mcleod
contact info
Defendant
F&V Framing LLC
Defendant
Dogwood Exteriors LLC
Defendant
John Doe #27-50
Defendant
Jane Doe #1-10
Defendant
Davis Framing LLC
Defendant
Cristobal and Painters LLC
Defendant
Cothran Landscapes and Grading LLC
Defendant
Builders First Source Inc
Defendant
Ashley Cothran
Defendant
Alpha Omega Construction Group Inc
FourthParty Defendant
Rafael A. Arevalo
Represented By
Eric Richard Tonnsen
Tonnsen Bach LLC
contact info
Robert Dale Holland, III
Eller Tonnsen Bach (gree)
contact info
FourthParty Plaintiff
K. C. Concepts, LLC
Represented By
Philip Paul Cristaldi, III
Ross And Cristaldi LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Coleman
Represented By
Kenneth Dalton Clifton
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
Jesse Allen Kirchner
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
William Duffie Powers
Gallivan White Boyd (gre)
contact info
Thomas Happel Scurry
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
Carter R Massingill
Gallivan White Boyd (gre)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Griffith
Represented By
Kenneth Dalton Clifton
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
Jesse Allen Kirchner
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
William Duffie Powers
Gallivan White Boyd (gre)
contact info
Thomas Happel Scurry
Thurmond Kirchner And Timbes PA
contact info
Carter R Massingill
Gallivan White Boyd (gre)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Artisan Specialties Group, LLC
110 Briarcliff Drive
Greenville, SC 29607
Represented By
Brian E Wolfe
Wolfe Campbell Gunst And Hinson PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
B&J Brothers Construction, LLC
1 Rimrock Avenue
Wellford, SC 29385
ThirdParty Defendant
Gary R Bradshaw
8 Catbriar Court
Simpsonville, SC 29680
Represented By
Philip Paul Cristaldi, III
Ross And Cristaldi LLC
contact info
Rosie Alexandra Escalante
Ross And Cristaldi LLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
William Bush
17 Monaghan Avenue
Greenville, SC 29617
ThirdParty Defendant
K. C. Concepts, LLC
113 Muddy Ford Road
Greenville, SC 29615
Represented By
Philip Paul Cristaldi, III
Ross And Cristaldi LLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Ancil Clive Shrum
20 Boone Road P. O. Box 1818
Travelers Rest, SC 29690
Represented By
Scott Harris Winograd
Ross And Cristaldi LLC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
84 Lumber Company LP
Represented By
Jared Hudson Garraux
Richardson Plowden And Robinson (col)
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
68 68 misc Document Mailed Tue 01/14 11:55 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED66 Order on Motion to Remand placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Harold P. Welborn, Clerk - Pickens County Court of Common Pleas. (alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified NEF
67 67 misc Document E-Mailed Tue 01/14 11:49 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED66 Order on Motion to Remand to Harold P. Welborn, Pickens County Clerk of Court. (alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Remand Order,
Att: 2 Certified NEF
66 66 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Tue 01/14 11:34 AM
OPINION and ORDER granting 19 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/14/25.(alew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
64 64 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 01/09 2:54 PM
Gary R. Bradshaw d/b/a Gary's Trim's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gary R Bradshaw.(Cristaldi, Philip)
Related: [-]
63 63 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Thu 01/09 2:49 PM
Gary R. Bradshaw d/b/a Gary's Trim's ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,, by Gary R Bradshaw.(Cristaldi, Philip)
Related: [-]