California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-08954
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 12:18 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Lopez (1)
Terminated: 10/24/2024
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/27/2024 12:59 AM PDT
Monday, October 21, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Lopez (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 OUT OF DISTRICT COMPLAINT as to Jesus Lopez. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Removal/ID Hearing set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Initial Appearance - ODC set for 10/24/2024 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (vyc)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance - Out of District Complaint as to Jesus Lopez held on 10/24/2024. Appearance entered by Federal Defenders for Jesus Lopez on behalf of defendant. Bond set as to Jesus Lopez (1) No Bail. Status Hearing Re Transportation set for 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Removal/ID Hearing as to Jesus Lopez held on 10/24/2024. Defendant waives ID. Waiver filed. Defendant ordered removed forthwith. Warrant of removal issued. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 10/24/2024 LR 24 3:55-4:01). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Lopez (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Jesus Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 10/24/2024. (vyc)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by Jesus Lopez (vyc)
Related: [-]
6 6 WARRANT of Removal to District of Eastern District of California Issued as to Jesus Lopez. (vyc)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE to Receiving District: (Eastern District of California), of Case Removal, as to Jesus Lopez. The following documents are available on the public docket:5 Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings,1 Out of District Complaint,6 Warrant of Removal Issued,4 Order re Rule 5(f) Advisal - Brady Advisal. To request additional transfer information and/or to submit acknowledgment re receipt of transfer, please email InterdistrictTransfer_CASD@casd.uscourts.gov.. (vyc)
Related: [-]