Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00158
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
defendant
Kirby Perrault (1)
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nils R. Kessler
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Nov 04 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Kirby Perrault as to the Felony Information be accepted; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
GPO Nov 19 2024
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 10 as to Kirby Perrault; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)

Docket last updated: 10/26/2024 5:51 AM EDT
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 4 pgs FELONY INFORMATION as to Kirby Perrault (mlc)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs PENALTY SHEET re Information - Felony1 as to Kirby Perrault (Kessler, Nils)
Related: [-]
3 3 11 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kirby Perrault (Kessler, Nils)
Related: [-]