Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01263
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 26, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Brian S. Deckert
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jamie Wright (1)
Terminated: 10/24/2024
Represented By
Noah C. Munyer
Ohio Defense Firm - Akron
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/26/2024 5:46 AM EDT
Thursday, October 24, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Jamie Wright (1) on 10/24/2024 - Self-Surrender. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Jamie Wright (1) held on 10/24/2024. AUSA Brian Deckert present for the government. Attorney Noah Munyer present for defendant. Defendant present. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Defendant advised of charges. Defendant waives identity and preliminary hearings. Waiver executed and accepted by Court. Government concurs with bond recommendation of Pretrial Services. Bond set at $20,000 unsecured with standard/special conditions. Government advised defendant's Initial Appearance set in charging district for 11/07/2024. Government requested a speedy trial delay under 18:3161(h)(1)(E) until the initial appearance scheduled for 11/7/2024. Defense did not oppose. Court took matter under advisement. (Court Reporter ECRO: C. Eckert; Pretrial Officer: Armonty Bennett) Time: 15 minutes. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Order [non-document]: Government's oral motion for speedy trial delay until 11/7/2024 is granted as to Jamie Wright (1). Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 10/24/2024. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Notice to District of Columbia of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Jamie Wright (1). Your case number is: 1:24mj335. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entry via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:4 Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing,6 Order Setting Conditions of Release,5 Bond,7 Warrant of Removal Issued,1 Rule 40 Warrant from Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to ohndml_InterDistrictTransfer@ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (P,G)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 40 Warrant received as to Jamie Wright (1)(P,G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Affidavit - Statement of Facts
2 2 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Noah C. Munyer appearing for Jamie Wright (1) (Munyer, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings (identity and preliminary) by Jamie Wright (1) (P,G)
Related: [-]
5 5 Appearance Bond Entered as to Jamie Wright (1) in amount of $ 20,000, unsecured. (P,G)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 10/24/2024. (P,G)
Related: [-]
7 7 Warrant of Removal/Order requiring Defendant to Appear in the District Where charges are Pending (District of Columbia) Issued as to Jamie Wright (1) by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (P,G)
Related: [-]
8 8 Receipt for Passport of Jamie Lee Wright received on 10/24/2024, Receipt Number A278. (B,DL)
Related: [-]