Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-01933
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Office of the Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Lakisha Davis
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Lakisha Davis
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Lamis Abousrea
David Stoller 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812
Represented By
David Stoller
Law Offices Of David Stoller, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdelrahman Elaidy
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812
Represented By
David Stoller
Law Offices Of David Stoller, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ahmed Elaidy
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812
Represented By
David Stoller
Law Offices Of David Stoller, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Amr Elaidy
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812
Represented By
David Stoller
Law Offices Of David Stoller, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenzi Elaidy
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812
Represented By
David Stoller
Law Offices Of David Stoller, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/09 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/08 3:27 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case re 20 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/8/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Wed 05/07 4:34 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Lamis Abousrea, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Amr Elaidy, Kenzi Elaidy (Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/18 11:08 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 20, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/18/2025. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 04/17 5:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Davis, Lakisha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Modified on 4/18/2025 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/19 10:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 21, 2025. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/19/2025. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 02/18 12:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to the Complaint by All Defendants. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/27 11:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 18, 2025. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 11/27/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/26 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 11/26 2:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Davis, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
12 12 service Summons returned executed as to USA Sun 11/17 2:45 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Amr Elaidy, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Lamis Abousrea, Kenzi Elaidy. All Defendants.(Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service, US Att'y General,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Office of the US Attorney
11 11 service Summons returned executed Sun 11/17 2:44 PM
RETURN of service executed on 11/06/2024 by Amr Elaidy, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Lamis Abousrea, Kenzi Elaidy as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons Jaddou (Served),
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Jaddou
10 10 service Summons returned executed Sun 11/17 2:43 PM
RETURN of service executed on 11/06/2024 by Amr Elaidy, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Lamis Abousrea, Kenzi Elaidy as to Secretary, Department of Homeland Security.(Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons Mayorkas (Served),
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, Mayorkas
Friday, November 08, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Order by Lamis Abousrea, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Amr Elaidy, Kenzi Elaidy. (Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 11/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lamis Abousrea, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Amr Elaidy, Kenzi Elaidy. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 11/08 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Stoller on behalf of Lamis Abousrea, Abdelrahman Elaidy, Ahmed Elaidy, Amr Elaidy, Kenzi Elaidy. Lead Counsel: David Stoller. (Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Tue 10/29 3:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/29/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Tue 10/29 3:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued a Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/29/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 10/29 8:51 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (JK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 10/29 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/28 3:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-1933-WWB-RMN. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 10/26 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22656094) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Stoller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Biometrics Notices,
Att: 3 Exhibit USCIS Announcement Regarding Asylum Interview Scheduling Changes,
Att: 4 Exhibit USCIS Announcement Regarding Access to Online Case Status,
Att: 5 Exhibit Current Case Status,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Mayorkas,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Jaddou