Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:24-cv-00614
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Cincinnati Public Schools
Represented By
Evan T Priestle
Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sally Ann Zwicker
Represented By
Andrew Rozynski
Eisenberg & Baum, LLP
contact info
Stephen M Dane
Dane Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
9 9 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 01/13 5:01 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 1/31/25. Motions to amend the pleadings and/or to add additional parties due by 2/28/25. Motions directed to pleadings due by 2/28/25. Lay Witnesses due by 5/30/25. Plaintiff Primary Experts due by 6/13/25. Defendant Primary Experts due by 7/18/25. Rebuttal Experts due by 8/1/25. Discovery due by 8/29/25. Dispositive motions due by 10/17/25. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/13/25. (sct)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/13 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone held on 1/13/25. Andrew Rozynski appeared for Plaintiff; Evan Priestle appeared for Defendant. Matters discussed. Calendar Order to issue. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 01/06 10:02 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendant Cincinnati Public Schools. (Priestle, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 9:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant filed by Cincinnati Public Schools. (Priestle, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 11/18 11:05 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cincinnati Public Schools. (Priestle, Evan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan T Priestle for Defendant Cincinnati Public Schools (Priestle, Evan)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/18 3:40 PM
Reset Deadlines: Cincinnati Public Schools answer due 12/12/2024 re6 . (bjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/13 9:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Cincinnati Public Schools. Cincinnati Public Schools served on 10/31/2024, answer due 11/21/2024. (Rozynski, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/28 8:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Public Schools. (kev)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 10/28 8:16 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kev)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/28 8:31 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Rozynski. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/28/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 27, 2024
2 2 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Sun 10/27 2:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10225102) of Andrew Rozynski by Plaintiff Sally Ann Zwicker. (Dane, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 10/27 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Public Schools ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10225098), filed by Sally Ann Zwicker. (Dane, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form