Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-02508
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC
Defendant
Denise Wolin
Mediator
Carlos J. Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hunter Supple
Represented By
Troy Edward Longman, II
Florin Gray
contact info
Miguel Bouzas
Florin Gray Bouzas Owens, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
24 24 motion Default - Default Judgment Mon 02/10 4:33 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC, Denise Wolin by Hunter Supple.(Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/16 3:36 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Denise Wolin (AMS)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/16 3:34 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC (AMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Wed 01/15 2:31 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants by Hunter Supple. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 12/30 10:17 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Carlos J. Burruezo of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
19 19 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 12/27 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Carlos Burruezo, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than March 10, 2025. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by January 22, 2025. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2024. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
18 18 service Summons returned executed Thu 12/26 3:34 PM
RETURN of service executed on December 18, 2024 by Hunter Supple as to Denise Wolin. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons returned executed Thu 12/26 3:33 PM
RETURN of service executed on December 18, 2024 by Hunter Supple as to Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 order Order Tue 12/03 4:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Supple is directed to file a status report on his efforts to perfect service of process on Defendants Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC and Denise Wolin by December 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/3/2024. (RAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 10/31 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Troy Edward Longman, II on behalf of Hunter Supple. Lead Counsel: Troy Longman. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 10/31 12:07 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All counsel of record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 10/30 5:15 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Hunter Supple. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 10/30 4:13 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hunter Supple. Related case(s): No (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/30 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/30 10:57 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
8 8 service Summons issued Tue 10/29 10:06 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Denise Wolin. (BD)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Tue 10/29 9:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court vacates the Notice of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. (Doc. # 6 ). The undersigned judge is not participating in the IDEAL Program and will be conducting all proceedings in this case in accordance with normal procedures. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to vacate the notice and the parties should disregard the notice. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/29/2024. (RAS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Tue 10/29 8:11 AM
VACATED per Endorsed Order 7. NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (AMS) Modified text on 10/29/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
5 5 service Proposed summons Mon 10/28 3:30 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hunter Supple. (Longman, Troy)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 10/28 2:51 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Royal Pets Market & Resort Midtown, LLC. (ARL)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/28 10:36 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-2508-VMC-CPT. (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed summons Mon 10/28 10:25 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hunter Supple. (Longman, Troy) **NOT ISSUED DUPLICATE Modified on 10/28/2024 as to docket text (ARL)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22657536) filed by Hunter Supple.(Longman, Troy) Modified on 10/28/2024 as to docket text(ARL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet ,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons ,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons **NOT ISSUED DUPLICATE