California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:24-cv-09243
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Micah Reed
Plaintiff
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Lisa Christine McCurdy
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Layal L. Bishara
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/14 4:16 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. On April 7, 2025, the plaintiff filed a request for entry of default by clerk against the interests of the Defendant(s). Default by clerk was entered on April 11, 2025. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment or, other appropriate dispositive motion on or before May 12, 2025. Failure to file said dispositive motion by May 12, 2025, will result in dismissal without further notice by the Court. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 04/11 3:26 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Micah Reed (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 04/11 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's Request for Default against Defendant, both filed on April 7, 2025. (Docket Nos. 15, 16.) The Court accepts Plaintiff's Request for Default as filed and hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause. The Clerk is directed to enter default against Defendant. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/09 2:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Request > Clerk to Enter Default. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 3 pgs misc Response Mon 04/07 1:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.to Order to Show Cause,,14 (Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 04/07 12:35 PM
Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1(Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration of Layal Bishara in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/01 11:00 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Generally, defendants must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States). Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1). In the present case, it appears that this time period has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before April 7, 2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Fri 03/28 7:49 AM
ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT MICAH REEDS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT12 by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 03/27 3:26 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/05/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Layal Bishara in Support of Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond,
Att: 2 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 02/18 5:42 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Micah Reed answer now due 3/20/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/20 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. upon Micah Reed waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/19/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Micah Reed. (Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 9:37 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Micah Reed. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Summons Request Mon 10/28 5:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
7 7 10 pgs order Order Mon 10/28 4:12 PM
STANDING ORDER READ by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 10/28 12:09 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/28 12:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/28 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/28 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/28 9:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/28 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38474062 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attorney Layal L. Bishara added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:pla))(Bishara, Layal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Exhibit A