Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Jon Phipps Mccalla
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02822
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Screening Reports, Inc.
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
Andrew Michael Schwartz
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Danita Walker
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info
Alain Cesar
Sanders Law Group
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
25 25 order Judgment Mon 03/17 4:00 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/17/2025. (mep)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/17 3:58 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/17/2025. (mep)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/13 8:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Danita Walker. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 03/05 4:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/5/2025. (mep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
21 21 order Order Tue 02/25 5:18 PM
***TEXT ORDER (NO IMAGE ATTACHED)*** re20 Response to Order to Show Cause. This matter is STAYED until February 28, 2025. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/25/2025. (mep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 02/12 3:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Danita Walker. (Cesar, Alain)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alain Cesar on behalf of Danita Walker (Cesar, Alain)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/11 12:12 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed with prejudice within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. If the Parties do not show cause by Tuesday, February 18, 2025, the case will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 2/11/2025. (Christoff, Annie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELATION: The Scheduling Conference set for January 6, 2025 is CANCELED and removed from the Court's schedule due to Notice of Settlement. (jrs)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 12/20 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Danita Walker (Cesar, Alain)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/17 3:02 PM
Order GRANTING13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/17/2024. (mep)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Courtesy Notice Tue 12/17 1:43 PM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by Danita Walker has been filed. For future reference, please note Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/17 1:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Danita Walker.(Cesar, Alain)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Submitted,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - Appellate,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing - EDNY
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 notice Deficiency Notice Mon 12/16 2:01 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4572819) filed by Danita Walker has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: : Filer failed to include the required TWO certificates of good standing (one must be from the highest court of the state). Filer also filed to include text "proposed order submitted". This motion will be termed, pending correct submission. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . (jae)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 1:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4572819) by Danita Walker.(Cesar, Alain)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
10 10 notice Setting Letter Wed 12/11 3:17 PM
SETTING LETTER: A VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is SET for MONDAY, JANUARY 6, 2025 at 11:00 A.M. (CT) before United States District Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Scheduling Conference will proceed by Zoom video conferencing. Zoom invitations will be sent by email in advance of the conference. (jrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 1:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Screening Reports, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BetterNOI, LLC for Screening Reports, Inc... (Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 1:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Screening Reports, Inc..(Schwartz, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/14 7:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Walker as to Screening Reports, Inc.. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 10/28 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Screening Reports, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Mon 10/28 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Mon 10/28 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Mon 10/28 10:03 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/28 10:01 AM
Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Screening Reports, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4534984), filed by Danita Walker.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons