Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-00451

West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 5:24-ap-00015
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
84 Lumber Co., LP
c/o Corporate Creations Network Inc. 126 East Burke Street
Martinsburg, WV 25401
Represented By
84 Lumber Co., LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Beaumier, Jr.
Represented By
Ryan Winquist Johnson
Johnson Legal Services, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arielle Beaumier
Represented By
Ryan Winquist Johnson
Johnson Legal Services, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/28 4:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (blw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Service Sat 12/21 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 order Default Judgment Wed 12/18 9:34 AM
Agreed Order Resolving Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (stb)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Tue 12/17 4:30 PM
Proposed Order Agreed Order Resolving Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Ryan Winquist Johnson on behalf of Donald Beaumier Jr. Related [+]. (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Donald Beaumier
Att: 1 Exhibit Email Consent
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 court AP BNC Certificate of Service - Manual Thu 12/12 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Notice
Monday, December 09, 2024
13 13 court Generic Notice (COURT USER) Mon 12/09 3:08 PM
Notice Related [+]. Objections due by 1/2/2025. (blw)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Donald Beaumier
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/09 9:09 AM
Motion for Default Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by Donald Beaumier Jr.. (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
11 11 court AP BNC Certificate of Service - Manual Sat 12/07 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 12/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 12/04 1:19 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. (blw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Donald Beaumier, Plaintiff Arielle Beaumier
9 9 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 12/04 11:32 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Ryan Winquist Johnson on behalf of Donald Beaumier Jr.. (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Service Thu 10/31 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 10/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/29 2:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on 84 Lumber Co., LP 10/29/2024 . (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 order Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/28 4:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Waive Adversary Filing Fee Related [+] (blw)
Related: [-] 4
Sunday, October 27, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Order Sun 10/27 7:00 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Ryan Winquist Johnson on behalf of Donald Beaumier Jr. related document(s)4 Miscellaneous Relief filed by Plaintiff Donald Beaumier). (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Sun 10/27 6:54 PM
Motion to Waive Adversary Filing Fee Filed by Ryan Winquist Johnson on behalf of Donald Beaumier Jr. (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/27 6:13 PM
Amended Complaint by Donald Beaumier Jr. against 84 Lumber Co., LP.. (Johnson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/25 3:27 PM
Summons Issued on 84 Lumber Co., LP Answer Due 11/25/2024. (jrm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 3:12 PM
Adversary case 5:24-ap-00015. Complaint by Donald Beaumier Jr., Arielle Beaumier against 84 Lumber Co., LP . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 . Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (jrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signed Order By Judge Bissett