Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-03010
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Case in other court:Arapahoe County District Court, 2024CV31728
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:01 AM MDT
Defendant
Lowes Home Center LLC
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Bryan
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Zachary Daniel Wagner
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rhonda Robertson
Represented By
Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Dulin Mcquinn Young
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 02/24 4:44 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 2/24/2025.(ccuen, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Memorandum Mon 02/24 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/24/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc7, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 motion Protective Order Fri 02/21 9:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Lowes Home Center LLC.(Wagner, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document Proposed Protective Order
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 12:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 01/08/2025. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 01/08 12:53 PM
COURTROOOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Scheduling Order entered. FTR: A502. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/03 4:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/3/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc7, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Reassigning Case Fri 01/03 9:44 AM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03010-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 01/02 4:16 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lowes Home Center LLC All parties do not consent.. (Wagner, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 12/30 4:23 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Lowes Home Center LLC. (Bryan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/30 3:09 PM
DISREGARD MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Rhonda Robertson. (sphil, ) Modified on 12/30/2024 FILED in wrong case. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
10 10 order Minute Order Fri 12/06 12:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/06/2024: The Parties are advised that the courtroom and chambers of Magistrate Judge Susan Prose will be relocated to Courtroom A502 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver Colorado effective December 11, 2024. Any parties wishing to appear in-person after this date should make note of the Court's new location. Remote appearance information, including teleconference lines or videoconference links, remain unchanged. The dates and times of all settings remain unchanged, unless otherwise ordered. Text Only Entry (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 9:32 AM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Lowes Home Center LLC.(Bryan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 4:40 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on October 30, 2024. Consent form due December 24, 2024 . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due December 31, 2024 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on January 8, 2025 , at 9:30 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 10/28 3:16 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 10/28 3:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Mon 10/28 3:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Coversheet upon Lowes Home Centers LLC on 10/7/2024, filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Robertson (efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Lowes Home Center LLC, filed by Rhonda Robertson.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Mon 10/28 3:14 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 10/28 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ethan A. McQuinn by Ethan Andrew McQuinn on behalf of Rhonda RobertsonAttorney Ethan Andrew McQuinn added to party Rhonda Robertson(pty:pla) (McQuinn, Ethan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/28 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowes Home Centers, LLC from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2024CV31728. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9954417), filed by Lowes Home Centers, LLC.(Bryan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I