New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-08180
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:May 19, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Luxus Botanica, L.P.
Represented By
Joshua Benjamin Hirshey
Kang Haggerty
contact info
Plaintiff
Tavon Turner
Represented By
Jon L. Norinsberg
Norinsberg Law
contact info
Arjeta Albani
Joseph And Norinsberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
19 19 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Tue 05/20 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Tavon Turner hereby gives notice that the above-captioned matter is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against defendant, Luxus Botanica L.P. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 5/20/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/16 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Luxus Botanica, L.P.. Document filed by Tavon Turner. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Albani, Arjeta)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Mon 02/24 2:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Arjeta Albani dated February 24, 2025 re: Executed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Tavon Turner..(Albani, Arjeta)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 order Memo Endorsement Mon 01/27 12:15 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Notice of Settlement filed by Luxus Botanica, L.P. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit a status letter confirming that they have finalized settlement no later than February 24, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 1/27/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Luxus Botanica, L.P...(Hirshey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/21 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joshua Benjamin Hirshey on behalf of Luxus Botanica, L.P.. New Address: Kang Haggerty LLC, 123 S. Broad Street, Suite 1950, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19109, 2155255850..(Hirshey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Mon 01/20 8:43 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Arjeta Albani, Esq. dated 1/20/2024 re: Status of Meet & Confer. Document filed by Tavon Turner..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/24 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arjeta Albani on behalf of Tavon Turner..(Albani, Arjeta)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/20 10:25 AM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court is in receipt of ECF 10. The parties' request for an extension of time to pursue settlement discussions is GRANTED. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding settlement of this action and to file a joint status letter on the docket by January 20, 2025, apprising the Court on the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF 10. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/20/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 4:30 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Joshua Hirshey, Esq. dated 12/17/2024. Document filed by Luxus Botanica, L.P...(Hirshey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Benjamin Hirshey on behalf of Luxus Botanica, L.P...(Hirshey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 5:50 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Luxus Botanica, L.P. served on 12/12/2024, answer due 1/2/2025. Service was accepted by Peter Casagtoni, Manager. Document filed by Tavon Turner..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 order Memo Endorsement Mon 11/18 4:33 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:6 Consent Order,,,,, ENDORSEMENT: The deadline for the parties to consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge is adjourned from November 13, 2024, to two weeks after the date the defendant makes an appearance in the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/18/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
6 6 order Consent Order Wed 11/06 2:55 PM
CONSENT ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to conduct all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, by November 13, 2024, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge forma copy of which is attached to this order. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter by November 13, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/5/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/06 2:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/5/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 12:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luxus Botanica, L.P...(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/29 12:05 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/29 12:05 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/29 12:06 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/28 3:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Luxus Botanica, L.P., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tavon Turner..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/28 3:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Luxus Botanica, L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30105484)Document filed by Tavon Turner..(Norinsberg, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Notice to Attorney General,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Legally Blind diagnosis,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Sort site report,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Wave report