Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:24-cv-02707
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC
Represented By
Brian S Cousin
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Erin Garza Kessinger
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Traci Krasne
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Jose Jara
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Del Bosque
2730 Oak Tree Drive Apt. 1009
Carollton, TX 75006
Represented By
Daniel L White
Ward White PLLC
contact info
Mark K Gyandoh
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
James A Maro
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jenna Rodriguez
1845 Pasadena Street
Houston, TX 77023
Represented By
Daniel L White
Ward White PLLC
contact info
Mark K Gyandoh
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
James A Maro
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fabiola Solis-Garay
408 S. Lucas Drive
Fort Liberty, NC 28307
Represented By
Daniel L White
Ward White PLLC
contact info
Mark K Gyandoh
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
James A Maro
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Ware
P.O. Box 771
Jewett, TX 75846
Represented By
Daniel L White
Ward White PLLC
contact info
Mark K Gyandoh
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
James A Maro
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Philip Watterson
7014 Windy Run Ct.
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
Daniel L White
Ward White PLLC
contact info
Mark K Gyandoh
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info
James A Maro
Capozzi Adler PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 7:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5) filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Kessinger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned Fri 04/18 9:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC ; served on 4/16/2025. (Gyandoh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC. (agc)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 04/15 10:15 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Monica Del Bosque, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Nicole Ware, Philip Watterson. (Gyandoh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
15 15 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 5:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Traci Krasne. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/16/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 5:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jose Jara. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/16/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/16 5:37 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian S. Cousin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/16/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
12 12 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/13 8:18 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Traci Krasne (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15128126) filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC (Kessinger, Erin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/13 8:16 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jose Jara (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15128125) filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC (Kessinger, Erin)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/13 8:13 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brian S. Cousin (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15128124) filed by Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC Attorney Erin Garza Kessinger added to party Coca-Cola Southwest Beverage LLC(pty:dft) (Kessinger, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/07 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark K. Gyandoh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/7/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 7:38 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15039995) filed by Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Monica Del BosqueAttorney Mark K Gyandoh added to party Philip Watterson(pty:pla), Attorney Mark K Gyandoh added to party Nicole Ware(pty:pla), Attorney Mark K Gyandoh added to party Jenna Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Mark K Gyandoh added to party Fabiola Solis-Garay(pty:pla), Attorney Mark K Gyandoh added to party Monica Del Bosque(pty:pla) (Gyandoh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cert of Good Standing - MKG,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
7 7 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/01 3:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Maro. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/1/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 2:58 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15032209) filed by Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Monica Del BosqueAttorney James A Maro added to party Philip Watterson(pty:pla), Attorney James A Maro added to party Nicole Ware(pty:pla), Attorney James A Maro added to party Jenna Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney James A Maro added to party Fabiola Solis-Garay(pty:pla), Attorney James A Maro added to party Monica Del Bosque(pty:pla) (Maro, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/29 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel L White on behalf of Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Monica Del Bosque. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (White, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 qcref Lindsay Tue 10/29 8:29 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 10/28 2:57 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Monica Del Bosque. (White, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 10/28 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware, Jenna Rodriguez, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Monica Del Bosque. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (White, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Monica Del Bosque, Fabiola Solis-Garay, Jenna Rodriguez, Philip Watterson, Nicole Ware. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15021089) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (White, Daniel)
Related: [-]