Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Case #: 9:24-cv-81352
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 7:13 AM EDT
Defendant
City Of Boynton Beach
100 E Boynton Beach Blvd.
Boynton Beach, FL 33435
Represented By
George Demetrios Lagos
City Of Boynton Beach
contact info
Defendant
City of Boca Raton
201 W Palmetto Park Rd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok,p.L.
contact info
Defendant
H. Howard (2213 B2)
Boca Raton Police Services Department 100 NW Boca Raton Blvd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Defendant
M. Carelli (857)
Boca Raton Police Services Department 100 NW Boca Raton Blvd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Defendant
Officer Corum (Id 794)
Boynton Beach Police Department 2100 High Ridge Road
Boynton Beach, FL 33426
Defendant
S.T. Radford (2213, B5)
Boca Raton Police Services Department 100 NW Boca Raton Blvd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Defendant
T. Mendoza (860)
Boca Raton Police Services Department 100 NW Boca Raton Blvd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Defendant
Amanda Corum
Represented By
Don Stephens
Olds & Stephens
contact info
Defendant
Antonio Donnino
Represented By
James Raymond Jimenez
Roberts, Reynolds, Bedard And Tuzzio, PLLC
contact info
Lyman Hawley Reynolds, Jr.
Roberts Reynolds Bedard & Tuzzio
contact info
Defendant
Peter Picciano
Represented By
Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Lavaglio
Miami, FL 33162
Represented By
David Lloyd Perkins
Hoffmna, Larin And Agnetti, P.A.
contact info
John Bradley Agnetti
Hoffman Larin & Agnetti
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Boca Raton Police Services Department
Terminated: 02/20/2025
100 NW Boca Raton Blvd
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok,p.L.
contact info
Defendant
Boynton Beach Police Department
Terminated: 02/12/2025
City of Boynton Beach Police Department 2100 High Ridge Road
Boynton Beach, FL 33426
Represented By
George Demetrios Lagos
City Of Boynton Beach
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
73 73 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Wed 05/14 6:55 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF MELISSA LAVAGLIO against Peter Picciano filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Melissa Lavaglio.(Perkins, David)
Related: [-]