Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:24-cv-00387
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
GAS POS INC
JOSHUA SMITH 419 NORTH MAIN STREET SUITE 200
NORTH LITTLE ROCK, AR 72114
Represented By
SIGFREDO RUBIO
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNON MULLEN
568 MCKENZIE RD
MILNER, GA 30257
Represented By
JONATHAN B FRANK
contact info
LINWOOD GUNN, IV
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 7 pgs respm Surreply Related to Motion Mon 04/07 10:09 AM
SURREPLY filed by KENNON MULLEN re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (FRANK, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 order Order Tue 03/25 8:45 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER . The plaintiff shall file a surreply in response to the defendant's argument that any default is cured because the American Arbitration Association will hear this case. The plaintiff's response is due April 8, 2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 03/25/25. (tss)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/17 7:01 PM
REPLY to Response filed by GAS POS INC re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration(RUBIO, SIGFREDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2025.03.03 - AAA and Gas POS Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2025.03.12 - Supplemental Declaration of Josh Smith
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 03/17 11:18 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document exceeds page limit. Leave of court required before filing. See Local Rule 7.4 Notice of Deficiency Document must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Notice of Deficiency Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Reply to Response to Motion.(bcl)
Related: [-] 15 Response to Motion filed by GAS POS INC
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 17 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 03/14 4:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by GAS POS INC re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration(RUBIO, SIGFREDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit B - 2025.03.03 - AAA and Gas POS Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - 2025.03.12 - Supplemental Declaration of Josh Smith
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 misc Jurisdictional Statement Thu 03/13 4:51 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by GAS POS INC (RUBIO, SIGFREDO)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 3:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GAS POS INC (RUBIO, SIGFREDO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 03/12 11:58 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(rka)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint filed by GAS POS INC
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 4 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 03/07 2:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by KENNON MULLEN re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration(FRANK, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - AAA filing confirmation,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - AAA 7/25/24 letter re: demand for arbitration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Jonathan Frank email dated 7/29/24 with demand for arbitration
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 11 pgs motion Compel Mon 03/03 4:55 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by GAS POS INC filed by SIGFREDO RUBIO.(RUBIO, SIGFREDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joshua Smith
10 10 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 4:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by GAS POS INC.(RUBIO, SIGFREDO)Attorney SIGFREDO RUBIO added to party GAS POS INC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENNON MULLEN as to GAS POS INC. (GUNN, LINWOOD)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 02/04 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by LINWOOD GUNN, IV(GUNN, LINWOOD)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/04 11:09 AM
*** DISREGARD REFILED AT 9 *** AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Corporation Service Company on 1/24/2025, filed by KENNON MULLEN. (GUNN, LINWOOD) Modified on 2/4/2025 TO ADD DISREGARD NOTICE (elp).
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 02/04 1:01 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Summons Returned Executed. Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process >Summons Returned Executed.(elp)
Related: [-] 7 Affidavit of Service filed by KENNON MULLEN
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 2:34 PM
Summons Issued as to GAS POS INC. (rka)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Amended Document Fri 01/17 1:09 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by KENNON MULLEN,amending2 Summons Issued (GUNN, LINWOOD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
4 4 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Tue 01/07 9:30 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JONATHAN B FRANK. (ksl)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 9:27 AM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KENNON MULLEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4837917, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: E. Linwood Gunn, 315265.(FRANK, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing United States District Court - Eastern District of Michigan
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 8:24 AM
Summons Issued as to GAS POS INC. (rka) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/29/2024) (rka).
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 19 pgs misc Complaint Mon 10/28 5:29 PM
COMPLAINT against GAS POS INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4782537, $405 filed by KENNON MULLEN(GUNN, LINWOOD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET,
Att: 2 Summons SUMMONS