Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:24-cv-04107
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Case in other court:Franklin County Common Pleas, 24 CV 007413
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 6:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew T Anderson
Luper Neidenthal & Logan
contact info
Melissa D. Stephenson
Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff
contact info
Matthew Scott Ponzi
Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC
Represented By
Shannon E Loyd
The Loyd Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Brennan Thomas Osborn
Bevan And Associates Lpa, Inc.
contact info
Bruce Carter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/11 11:52 AM
ANSWER to32 Amended Complaint filed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/04 12:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected Case Caption only) against Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC. (Loyd, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/01 2:06 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/19/2025. Dispositive motions due by 10/3/2025. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/24/2025. Defendant Primary Expert due by 8/4/2025. Settlement Demand due by 10/17/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/31/2025. Mediation Deadline: 11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 1, 2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines Tue 04/01 2:06 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/19/2025. Dispositive motions due by 10/3/2025. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/24/2025. Defendant Primary Expert due by 8/4/2025. Settlement Demand due by 10/17/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/31/2025. Mediation Deadline: 11/2025. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/31 4:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/31/2025. Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC. (Loyd, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/26 4:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC.(per Doc.28 ) (acw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/25 2:21 PM
ORDER Granting27 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and amend the case caption accordingly. (26 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/25/2025. (vb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/24 2:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File CORRECTED Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC. (Loyd, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/24 2:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC. (Loyd, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
25 25 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 12/18 1:42 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/18/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/17 4:45 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC Stipulated Protective Order (Loyd, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
23 23 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 12/16 4:38 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 12/17/2024. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 2/10/2025. Discovery due by 7/21/2025. (If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court). Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 12/17/2024. Dispositive motions due by 6/23/2025. Primary Expert due by 4/25/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/5/2025. Settlement Demand due by 8/4/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/18/2025. Mediation Deadline: 9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/16/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 12/16 4:31 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File an Appearance to Substitute as Plaintiff's Trial Attorney and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/16/2024. (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Tue 12/10 7:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Substitute as Trial Attorney by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC. (Osborn, Brennan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/06 2:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/06 9:21 AM
NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2024 10:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No.18 .) (sln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/05 11:43 AM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 12/5/2024. (merc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
18 18 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 12/03 11:43 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/26 1:47 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa D. Stephenson. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/26/2024. (mve)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/26 1:25 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon Loyd. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/26/24. (sem)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 11/26 12:38 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee paid: $200, Receipt No: 200007848. (Shannon Loyd) (vb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10266099) of Melissa D. Stephenson by Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Florida
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/19 9:28 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Ponzi. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/19/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
13 13 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/18 12:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10254919) of Matthew S. Ponzi by Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission from Illinois Supreme Court for Matthew Ponzi
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Wed 11/13 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Shannon Loyd filed by Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC: Admission Fee. The admission fee has not been remitted. The fee can be paid by mailing in the payment, hand-delivered or through CM/ECF, using the event Pay Fees via Pay.Gov . Deficiency Deadline due by 11/27/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Wed 11/13 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa D. Stephenson filed by Greater New York Insurance Company: Certificate of Good Standing. The Certificate of Good Standing is not from the highest court of a state or the District of Columbia. Deficiency Deadline due by 11/27/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 5:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Shannon Loyd by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC (Carter, Bruce) Modified on 11/13/2024 to correct filing party (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Tue 11/12 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Shannon Lloyd filed by Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC: Admission Fee. The admission fee has not been remitted. The fee can be paid by mailing in the payment, hand-delivered or through CM/ECF, using the event Pay Fees via Pay.Gov . Certificate of Good Standing. The filing does not include a Certificate of Good Standing. Deficiency Deadline due by 11/26/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/12 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2024 10:00 AM via Zoom Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10245256) of Melissa D. Stephenson by Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Melissa Stephenson's Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, November 11, 2024
6 6 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/11 2:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Shannon Lloyd by Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC, Defendant Greater New York Insurance Company. (Carter, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Carter for Plaintiff Emerald of Dublin Master, LLC (Carter, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 3:45 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 notice Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tue 10/29 11:13 AM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Brennan T Osborn and Shannon E Loyd by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Emerald of Dublin Master LLC against Greater New York Insurance Company (kk2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/28 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas, case number 24CV007413 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10226852), filed by Greater New York Insurance Company. (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Docket,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet