California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-09259
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Scott Arceneaux, Jr.
Represented By
Joshua Aryeh-Lev Bornstein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Timothy C. Matson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Meeghan Henry Tirtasaputra
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
G59 Records, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Aryeh-Lev Bornstein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Timothy C. Matson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Meeghan Henry Tirtasaputra
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aristos Petrou
Represented By
Joshua Aryeh-Lev Bornstein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Timothy C. Matson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Meeghan Henry Tirtasaputra
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ivan Ramirez
Represented By
Robert A Jacobs
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Sarah Emily Moses
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Orchard Enterprises NY, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Aryeh-Lev Bornstein
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Timothy C. Matson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Meeghan Henry Tirtasaputra
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul D. Beauregard
Represented By
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano LLP
contact info
Jackson Samuel Trugman
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano, LLC
contact info
Heather Lynn Pickerell
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Houston
Represented By
Howard E King
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano LLP
contact info
Jackson Samuel Trugman
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano, LLC
contact info
Heather Lynn Pickerell
King Holmes Paterno And Soriano, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
UMG Recordings Inc
Terminated: 02/24/2025
Represented By
Benjamin S. Akley
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Capitol Records, LLC
Terminated: 02/24/2025
Represented By
Benjamin S. Akley
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
50 50 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/18 10:50 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ivan Ramirez, identifying None. (Jacobs, Robert)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/18 8:10 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
49 49 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 10:00 AM
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING MEDIATION46 by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Mediation. Having considered the Stipulation and the record in this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Stipulation is DENIED. (aco)
Related: [-]
47 47 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/17 11:33 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,22 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Ivan Ramirez.(Jacobs, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
46 46 stip Stay Case Fri 03/14 6:03 PM
First STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Plaintiffs Paul D. Beauregard, Jordan Houston.(Pickerell, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration ISO Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Mediation
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
45 45 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/12 3:46 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of October 6, 2025; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of October 20, 2025; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for November 21, 2025, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of December 16, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. (aco)
Related: [-]
44 44 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 03/12 1:38 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 15, 2025 re Amended Complaint/Petition,22 filed by Defendant Ivan Ramirez.(Moses, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sarah E. Moses,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
43 43 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/12 11:43 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for March 24, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. Final Pretrial Conference 11/21/25 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial 12/16/25 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 03/12 11:37 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 27, 2025. (aco)
Related: [-]