Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: Brooks G Severson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02491
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Michelle Hubbard
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
USD 512 Shawnee Mission
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
David Westbrook
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Brad Stratton
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Mary Sinclair
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Michael Schumacher
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Heather Ousley
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Borgman
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Higgins
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Jessica Hembree
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Sara Goodburn
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Joe Gilhaus
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Mario Garcia
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
David Ewers
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
Rachel England
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Defendant
April Boyd-Noronha
Represented By
Gregory P. Goheen
Mcanany, Van Cleave & Phillips, Pa - Kck
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Caedran Sullivan
Represented By
Fritz Edmunds, Jr.
Edmunds Law Office, LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 2/25/2025. (msb)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
58 58 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/07 11:37 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant USD 512 Shawnee Mission re:39 Motion to Dismiss (Goheen, Gregory)
Related: [-]
57 57 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/07 9:37 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Jamie Borgman, April Boyd-Noronha, Rachel England, David Ewers, Mario Garcia, Joe Gilhaus, Sara Goodburn, Jessica Hembree, Jeremy Higgins, Michelle Hubbard, Heather Ousley, Michael Schumacher, Mary Sinclair, Brad Stratton, David Westbrook re:37 Motion to Dismiss, (Goheen, Gregory)
Related: [-]
56 56 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/07 9:34 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Jamie Borgman, April Boyd-Noronha, Rachel England, David Ewers, Mario Garcia, Joe Gilhaus, Sara Goodburn, Jessica Hembree, Jeremy Higgins, Michelle Hubbard, Heather Ousley, Michael Schumacher, Mary Sinclair, Brad Stratton, David Westbrook re:35 Motion to Dismiss, (Goheen, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
55 55 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/28 10:10 AM
ORDER Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.54 ). Defendants must file their Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss (Docs.35 ,37 and39 ) by March 7, 2025. Defendants are granted an additional 10 pages for their reply briefs in support of motions (Docs 37 & 39). Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/28/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
Related: [-]