Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00868
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By
Barry Kenneth Shelton
Shelton Coburn LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Bradley Dalton Coburn
Shelton Coburn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stingray IP Solutions LLC
6136 Frisco Sq. Blvd. Suite 400
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Terry Afif Saad
Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
contact info
Marcus Benavides
Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
contact info
Mark Douglass
Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
contact info
Brandon V. Zuniga
Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
contact info
Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Bragalone Olejko Saad PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
44 44 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/25 6:48 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC . (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/18 4:59 PM
ORDER granting42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to41 Reply to Response to Motion Responses due by 3/25/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/18/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/17 12:38 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to41 Reply to Response to Motion by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/11 4:00 PM
REPLY to Response re23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company . (Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 03/05 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company regarding Invalidity Contentions and Subject Matter Eligibility Contentions (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/03 12:11 PM
ORDER granting38 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 Replies due by 3/11/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/3/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/03 7:52 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
37 37 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/24 11:46 PM
RESPONSE re23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC .(Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
36 36 order Protective Order Wed 02/19 4:07 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (Motion(s)35 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
35 35 motion Protective Order Tue 02/18 4:55 PM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 02/13 9:15 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 02/11 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 4:06 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
31 31 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/06 11:38 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER re28 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/5/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
30 30 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Thu 02/06 11:36 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re27 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC., Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2026 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 7/6/2026 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 1/16/2026 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (Motion(s)27 terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/5/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/06 11:28 AM
ORDER granting26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 Responses due by 2/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/5/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/04 2:56 PM
JOINT MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Discovery Order
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/04 2:55 PM
JOINT MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Docket Control Order
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/04 2:23 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 02/03 6:48 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company re23 OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Letter Brief
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 01/24 7:31 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 7:27 PM
OPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,678,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,440,572,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,616,961,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - HPE Aruba 750 Data Sheet,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Tue 01/28 3:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2025 from 01:32 PM - 02:35 PM. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether the parties consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court proceeded to provide counsel with Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter - Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 4:58 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/08 9:55 AM
ORDER granting19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company answer due 1/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/8/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 01/07 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/06 3:16 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 3:41 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company answer is now due 1/6/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(NKL)
Related: [-]
17 17 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 2:57 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Summons originally served on 10/30/2024. Agreed new answer date is January 6, 2025.(Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/11 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Tue 12/10 11:27 AM
ORDER Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/9/24. (bga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
14 14 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 11/12 10:24 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/12 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Dalton Coburn on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Coburn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/12 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Kenneth Shelton on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Shelton, Barry)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 11/12 11:42 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company to 12/20/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/01 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company served on 10/30/2024. (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/01 9:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Patent Infringement served on Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company on 10/30/2024, filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/30 7:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Douglass on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Douglass, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/30 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Saad, Terry)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/30 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Benavides, Marcus)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 10/30 6:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon V. Zuniga on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Zuniga, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 10/29 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Fair, Andrea)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company c/o C T Corporation System. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 10/28 4:40 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 10/28 4:35 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10444850.), filed by Stingray IP Solutions LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/28/2024) Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/28 4:40 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 10/28 4:40 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]