Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:24-bk-21209
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Claims Deadline:Jan 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ShiftPixy, Inc.
4101 NW 25th St
Miami, FL 33142-6725
Represented By
Isaac M Marcushamer, Esq.
Dgim Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 10/27/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Monday, October 28, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 10/28 6:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-21209 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45049863. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Mon 10/28 6:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 01/6/2025. (Marcushamer, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Concerning Schedules Mon 10/28 6:45 PM
Declaration Concerning Schedules Conforming to Official Bankruptcy Form 106 or 202 Filed by Debtor ShiftPixy, Inc. Related [+]. (Marcushamer, Isaac)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor ShiftPixy, Inc.