Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Jacqueline M Deluca
Case #: 8:24-cv-00421
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:42 AM CDT
Defaulted Defendant
Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC
a Georgia limited liability corporation Address Updated 1/31/25 c/o Scotty Fain II, Registered Agent 270 N Main Street
Hiawassee, GA 30548
Plaintiff
Naples SEO Company, LLC
Represented By
Frederick L. Abboud
Horgan Law Firm
contact info
Thomas E. Horgan
Horgan Law LLC
contact info
Julie A. Greenamyre
Horgan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 order Order - Text Only Mon 03/31 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER that this case is dismissed per the filing of the plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Filing No.19 ). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This case is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 03/28 10:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by Attorney Frederick L. Abboud on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC.(Abboud, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to dismiss without prejudice
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 03/12 3:28 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC's Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No.16 ) is denied. Naples shall have until April 2, 2025, to show cause why its complaint (Filing No.1 ) should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of Naples's complaint without further notice. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to defendant) (JSF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 order Strike Order Tue 03/11 10:45 AM
TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Summons Returned Executed (Filing No.11 ) is stricken for the following reason: the document is a duplicate of Filing No.9 . Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/31 4:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC by Attorney Frederick L. Abboud on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC.(Abboud, Frederick)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/31 12:57 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant)(LRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 motion Clerks Entry of Default Wed 01/29 3:53 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC by Attorney Frederick L. Abboud on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC.(Abboud, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request to Enter Default of Defendant
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Frederick L. Abboud on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC (Abboud, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 01/28 11:54 AM
ORDER Plaintiff's motion for default judgment, Filing No.10 , is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/22 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon The Secretary of State of Georgia for defendant Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC on 12/26/2024. (Horgan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/21 12:05 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Hiawassee River Retreat by Attorney Thomas E. Horgan on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC.(Horgan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Georgia Secretary of State of defendant Naples SEO Company, LLC on 12/26/2024. (Horgan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 01/15 10:30 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC. (Horgan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Tue 10/29 2:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Julie A. Greenamyre on behalf of Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC.(Greenamyre, Julie)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Requested Tue 10/29 2:13 PM
Summons Requested as to Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC, d/b/a Retreat at Hiawassee River regarding Complaint1 . (Greenamyre, Julie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 10:14 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Naples SEO Company, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Tue 10/29 10:13 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 service Summons Requested Mon 10/28 4:56 PM
Summons Requested as to Hiawassee River Retreat, LLC, d/b/a Retreat at Hiawassee River regarding Complaint1 . (Greenamyre, Julie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hawassee River Retreat, LLC d/b/a Retreat at Hiawassee River ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5188858), by Attorney Julie A. Greenamyre on behalf of Naples SEO Company(Greenamyre, Julie)
Related: [-]