California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02293
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Cricket Wireless LLC
Represented By
Walid Abdul-Rahim
At And T Service Inc.
contact info
Raymond Paul Bolanos
At And T Services Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jiebo Cao
Represented By
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/26 10:21 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed March 17, 2025 (Dkt. No. 20 ), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By May 15, 2025, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of May 16, 2025. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
21 21 respm Statement (Motion related) Sat 03/22 9:50 PM
STATEMENT of Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration18 filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. (Abdul-Rahim, Walid)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/17 6:59 PM
Notice Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. (Abdul-Rahim, Walid)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/04 1:33 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 03/03 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Abdul-Rahim, Walid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Dailey Declaration ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Dailey Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Dailey Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Dailey Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Dailey Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Dailey Declaration,
Att: 7 Declaration Abdul-Rahim Declaration ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Abdul-Rahim Declaration
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 02/11 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Walid Abdul-Rahim counsel for Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. Adding Walid S Abdul-Rahim as counsel of record for Cricket Wireless LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. (Attorney Walid Abdul-Rahim added to party Cricket Wireless LLC(pty:dft))(Abdul-Rahim, Walid)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 02/10 7:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/26 4:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC identifying AT&T Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bolanos, Raymond)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 12/26 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12/23 4:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Cricket Wireless LLC Cricket Wireless LLC.(Bolanos, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Sun 11/24 5:02 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cricket Wireless LLC answer now due 12/26/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC.(Attorney Raymond Paul Bolanos added to party Cricket Wireless LLC(pty:dft))(Bolanos, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 11/04 3:55 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 10:51 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cricket Wireless LLC. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 notice Summons Request Tue 10/29 12:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jiebo Cao. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 10/29 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/29 10:04 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/29 10:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/29 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/28 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jiebo Cao, (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 10/28 3:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jiebo Cao. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 10/28 3:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jiebo Cao. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/28 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38480228 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jiebo Cao. (Attorney Gerald Donald Lane, Jr added to party Jiebo Cao(pty:pla))(Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]