Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-42547
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 19, 2024

Debtor
NuTex Mechanical, LLC
161 S McKinley St
Prosper, TX 75078-3302
Represented By
William J. Collins
Collins & Arnove PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle Chow
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 16200 Addison Road, Suite 140
Addison, TX 75001
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 10/29/2024 12:04 AM CDT
Monday, October 28, 2024
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Mon 10/28 2:58 PM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by NuTex Mechanical, LLC Document Due 11/4/2024. (Collins, William)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 10/28 3:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-42547 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13574547, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 10/28 2:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by NuTex Mechanical, LLC, Document Due 11/4/2024.(Collins, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Mon 10/28 11:49 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Chow, Michelle with 341(a)
Related: [-]