Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01448
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Francisco Balderas Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 10/29/2024 2:36 AM CDT
Saturday, October 26, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Francisco Balderas Gonzalez (1), filed (McMullen). Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (clr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Francisco Balderas Gonzalez, filed. (clr5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on October 26, 2024 at 01:00 PM as to Francisco Balderas Gonzalez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (clr5)
Related: [-]