North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 5:24-cv-00605
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
CoverMyMeds
Represented By
Tatiana Marie Terry
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Michael Douglas McKnight
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Tatiana Marie Terry
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Michael Douglas McKnight
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Delatour Dorval
9021 River Hawk Landing
Willow Spring, NC 27592


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 04/04 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/4/2025. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/04 2:12 PM
ORDER denying29 Motion for Leave to Submit Audio Recordings as Evidence; denying30 Motion for Leave to Submit Electronic Exhibits Via Flashdrive; denying5 Motion Requesting to Submit Audio Exhibits; granting18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying24 Motion for Recording. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/4/2025. Sent via US Mail to Christina Delatour Dorval at 9021 River Hawk Landing, Willow Spring, NC 27592. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Tue 03/18 2:09 PM
Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding24 MOTION for Recording,30 MOTION for Leave to File,18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM,5 MOTION Requesting to Submit Audio Exhibits,29 MOTION for Leave to File. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
33 33 13 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/07 4:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Mon 02/24 12:53 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Plaintiff to file and serve her amended response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including February 21, 2025. The deadline for Defendants to file and serve any reply to Plaintiff's Amended Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss will be March 7, 2025. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/24/2025. Sent via US Mail to Christina Delatour Dorval at 9021 River Hawk Landing, Willow Spring, NC 27592. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Sun 02/23 11:32 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding26 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 2 pgs notice Notice-other Mon 02/24 5:52 PM
Notice of Compliance with Word Count Requirements filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
31 31 30+ pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/24 5:51 PM
AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition regarding18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Titled Amended Motion for Retroactive Extension of Time to Organize Exhibits and Amend Motion) filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit BED - Timeline,
Att: 3 14 pgs Exhibit BEU - Suppression & Retaliation,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit BFU - Character Remarks,
Att: 5 Exhibit BFV - Strategy Realization,
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit BFW - Sharepoint 2023,
Att: 7 6 pgs Exhibit BEV - Financial Closure,
Att: 8 13 pgs Exhibit BEW - Bain Assessment,
Att: 9 Exhibit BDW - Recommendation Letters,
Att: 10 Exhibit AN - Onboarded 10/7/22,
Att: 11 Exhibit AH - Address Request,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit AM - Laptop Login 2022,
Att: 13 Exhibit B - Proposal 4/18/23,
Att: 14 1 pgs Exhibit BDN - Cohn 4/18/23,
Att: 15 Exhibit M - Screenshot 05/23 Meeting Notes,
Att: 16 1 pgs Exhibit BAH - Plaintiff's Calendar,
Att: 17 1 pgs Exhibit F - Brashear Acknowledgment,
Att: 18 2 pgs Exhibit G - Employee Opinion,
Att: 19 Exhibit BDU - CMM Tech Unification,
Att: 20 Exhibit BEL - Notes 10/4/23,
Att: 21 Exhibit BDJ - General LCMM Tech 10/20/23,
Att: 22 4 pgs Exhibit BDK - Support Julius 2023,
Att: 23 Exhibit BEI - FY24 Initiatives,
Att: 24 Exhibit BDL - Business Case 12/2023,
Att: 25 Exhibit BAA - Org Chart May 2024,
Att: 26 Exhibit BDV - Pay Process 2/21/24,
Att: 27 Exhibit BEC - Email Conf Brashear,
Att: 28 Exhibit Z - 3/4/24 Acknowledgment,
Att: 29 Exhibit BAC - Feedback Request,
Att: 30 Exhibit BAE - FY25 Initiative,
Att: 31 Exhibit AO - Org Chart 5/24,
Att: 32 Exhibit AP - Org Chart Brahear VP,
Att: 33 Exhibit BEB - Calendar Screenshot 5/24,
Att: 34 Exhibit BEG - Q4 Review,
Att: 35 Exhibit P - Email 5/3/24,
Att: 36 4 pgs Exhibit BDP - Document dated 5/16/24,
Att: 37 Exhibit AE - EEO Charge,
Att: 38 Exhibit AF - EEOC Notice,
Att: 39 Exhibit BEL - Notes from 10/10/23 Meeting,
Att: 40 Exhibit BES - Legal Notice,
Att: 41 Exhibit BEP - Settlement 11/4/24,
Att: 42 Exhibit BCV - WakeMed Letter dated 12/26/24,
Att: 43 Exhibit BAB - Seamans Retirement,
Att: 44 Exhibit BCZ - WakeMed Letter dated 1/27/25,
Att: 45 Exhibit BCE - Request 10/21/24,
Att: 46 Exhibit S - Kickoff Presentation,
Att: 47 Exhibit BDI - IMO Responsibilities 4/2023,
Att: 48 Exhibit BEE - 12/22 - 5/23 Optimization,
Att: 49 Exhibit BBW - Kelly Martin Witness Statement,
Att: 50 Exhibit AP - Org Chart - Kettier - 2024,
Att: 51 Exhibit AP - Org Chart - Elaine Murphy,
Att: 52 1 pgs Exhibit AP - HR Workday System,
Att: 53 Exhibit BDG - Code of Conduct,
Att: 54 Exhibit BDR - OneNote Penny Armijo,
Att: 55 Exhibit BEH - Plaintiff's Calendar 8/17/23,
Att: 56 3 pgs Exhibit BEM - Open Door Policy Doc,
Att: 57 1 pgs Exhibit BEN - Plainview SOW,
Att: 58 Exhibit BEO - Slack 8/2023,
Att: 59 Exhibit BBC - CMM Ops Review,
Att: 60 BEQ - 365 Integration,
Att: 61 1 pgs Exhibit BER - Leadership Term,
Att: 62 1 pgs Exhibit BEZ - Reassignment
30 30 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/24 4:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Submit Electronic Exhibits via Flash Drive filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
29 29 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/24 4:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Submit Audio Recordings as Evidence filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
27 27 1 pgs respm Proposed Order Mon 02/17 11:12 AM
Proposed Order on Plaintiff's "Motion for Retroactive Extension of Time to Organize Exhibits and Amend Motion" filed by CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
26 26 3 pgs motion Extension of Time-Other Thu 02/13 4:31 PM
MOTION for Retroactive Extension of Time to Organize Exhibits and Amend Motion filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 07, 2025
25 25 1 pgs notice Document Mon 02/10 5:31 PM
Word Count Certification filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/10 5:30 PM
MOTION for Recording filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
23 23 36 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/10 5:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Linkedin message Julius Morris,
Att: 2 19 pgs Exhibit H - Business Case,
Att: 3 Exhibit Q - 5/3/2024 Final Written Warning,
Att: 4 Exhibit V - Spotlight Recognition,
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit W - Program & Portfolio Certificate,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit X - Email from Ann Tackett,
Att: 7 1 pgs Exhibit Z - 3/4/24 Acknowledgement,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit AC - Breakout Deck,
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit AD - Integration Management,
Att: 10 Exhibit AE EEOC Charge,
Att: 11 Exhibit AF - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 12 1 pgs Exhibit BAE - FY25 Planning,
Att: 13 4 pgs Exhibit BAK - Presentation of New Roles,
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit BBC Sentiments of Employees,
Att: 15 1 pgs Exhibit BBY - Program Portfolio,
Att: 16 1 pgs Exhibit - BCE Urgent Request,
Att: 17 1 pgs Exhibit BCE - Urgent Request (2nd copy),
Att: 18 2 pgs Exhibit BCK - Kelly Martin Witness Letter,
Att: 19 1 pgs Exhibit BCO - Talent Reviews,
Att: 20 Exhibit BDE - Shelley R McCoy,
Att: 21 Exhibit BDF - Shelley McCoy text,
Att: 22 Exhibit BDL - Support from Julius Business Case,
Att: 23 1 pgs Exhibit BDN - 1x1 with Mike Cohn,
Att: 24 Exhibit BDP - FMLA Document,
Att: 25 1 pgs Exhibit BDR - OneNote Penny Armijo,
Att: 26 3 pgs Exhibit BDS - PPM Tookl,
Att: 27 1 pgs Exhibit BDT - Plaintiff's Planview,
Att: 28 1 pgs Exhibit BDV Plainview Payment Process,
Att: 29 Exhibit BDW - Recommendation Letters,
Att: 30 Exhibit BDX - Slack Kickoff,
Att: 31 4 pgs Exhibit BDZ Doctor Letters
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 10:46 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by CoverMyMeds identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for CoverMyMeds. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 01/17 10:43 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 1 pgs misc Rule 12 Letter Tue 01/14 9:19 AM
Rule 12 Letter Issued as to18 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 2/7/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
19 19 29 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 01/13 8:07 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A
18 18 4 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/13 8:04 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 3:12 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Defendants to file and serve a response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended to and including January 13, 2025. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/11/2024. Sent via US Mail to Christina Delatour Dorval at 9021 River Hawk Landing, Willow Spring, NC 27592. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 7 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/10 2:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Tue 12/10 1:52 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Tue 12/10 1:48 PM
Affidavit of Service for Amended Complaint, Order, Exhibits filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice-other Tue 12/10 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Correction to Provide Correct Addresses for Defendants filed by Christina Delatour Dorval regarding7 Amended Complaint. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/09 4:15 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 4:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of All Defendants. (McKnight, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 3:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Tatiana Marie Terry on behalf of All Defendants. (Terry, Tatiana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 4 pgs service Summons Reissued Tue 11/19 3:25 PM
Summons Reissued as to CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. Issued at Intake (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 4 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 11/14 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation. Issued at Intake (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs misc Affidavit Thu 11/14 12:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Corrected Financial Information regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christina Delatour Dorval filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/14 12:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CoverMyMeds, McKesson Corporation, filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Linkedin message Julius Morris,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B - IMO Proposal,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C - OneNote Screenshot 4/18/23,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit F - Email Kelly Brashear 9/25/24,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit G - Screenshots Empl Opinion Survey Resp,
Att: 6 19 pgs Exhibit H - Business Case,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit J - Screenshot 4/18/24 Presentation,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit K - Screenshot Daily Team Standups,
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit M - Screenshot May 2024, 2023 Meeting Notes,
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit N - Email Screenshots 5/1/24,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit P - Email Screenshot 5/3/24,
Att: 12 Exhibit Q - Screenshot of 5/3/24 Final Written Warning Document,
Att: 13 Exhibit R - Resignation Letter,
Att: 14 Exhibit S - RxSS Kickoff Presentation,
Att: 15 Exhibit T - CMM 365,
Att: 16 Exhibit U - Slack Kickoff Presentation,
Att: 17 Exhibit V - Spotlight Recognition,
Att: 18 1 pgs Exhibit W - Certificate,
Att: 19 Exhibit X - Email Ann Tackett,
Att: 20 Exhibit Y Email Diamara DeSouza,
Att: 21 2 pgs Exhibit Z - Ack of Skills,
Att: 22 Exhibit AA - 3/29/24 Chat Nasir Ahmed,
Att: 23 Exhibit AC - Breakout Deck,
Att: 24 1 pgs Exhibit AD - Playbook by Michael Cohn,
Att: 25 3 pgs Exhibit AE - EEOC Charge,
Att: 26 Exhibit AF - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 11/13 4:58 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 500013717. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/05 5:11 PM
ORDER - Given plaintiff's income and assets, the court DENIES plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis D.E.2 . Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/5/2024. Sent via US Mail to plaintiff at 9021 River Hawk Landing, Willow Spring, NC 27592. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Tue 10/29 1:25 PM
Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,5 MOTION Requesting to Submit Audio Exhibits. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
5 5 2 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/29 8:32 AM
MOTION Requesting to Submit Audio Exhibits filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 8:26 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 10/29 8:26 AM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/29 8:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to IFP
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 8:22 AM
COMPLAINT against CoverMyMeds, filed by Christina Delatour Dorval. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A- Messages between Christina Dorval and Julius Morris,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit AA- Chat with CTO Nasir Ahmed from 3/29/2024 (not legible),
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit AC- Strategic Priority Breakout Teams (not legible),
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit AD- Integration Management Office Culture Playbook by Michael Cohn (not legible),
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit AE- Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit AF- Determination and Notice of Rights,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit B- IMO Streamline Proposal Presented to Michael Cohn on 4/18/23,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit C- OneNote Screenshot of 4/18/23 meeting notes with Michael Cohn (not legible),
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit F- Email acknowledgement from Kelly Brashear of 9/25/24 (not legible),
Att: 10 1 pgs Exhibit G- Screen shot of plaintiff's 10/23 employee opinion survey response (not legible),
Att: 11 Exhibit H- Director of Portfolio Management Business Case,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit J- Screenshot of 4/18/23, presentation of new roles by Michael Cohn (not legible),
Att: 13 1 pgs Exhibit K- Screenshot of plaintiff's request to be included in daily team standups (not legible),
Att: 14 1 pgs Exhibit M- Screenshot of 5/24/23, meeting notes regarding director position justification,
Att: 15 1 pgs Exhibit N- Email screenshots from 5/1/24, requesting updates during personal emergency,
Att: 16 Exhibit P- Screenshot of 5/3/24, final written warning email,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q- Screenshot of 5/3/24, Final written warning document,
Att: 18 3 pgs Exhibit R- Plaintiff's resignation letter dated 10/18/24 (not legible),
Att: 19 Exhibit S- RxSS Kickoff Presentation (not legible),
Att: 20 Exhibit T- CMM 365 Go/No-Go and executive Communication (not legible),
Att: 21 Exhibit U- Slack to MS teams migration kickoff (not legible),
Att: 22 Exhibit V- Spotlight recognition from COO and VP of Technology,
Att: 23 Exhibit W- Program Portfolio Management Certification,
Att: 24 1 pgs Exhibit X- Email from Ann Tackett on Career Development Opportunities and Meeting Notes with Biron Pickens (not legible),
Att: 25 1 pgs Exhibit Y- February 2024 Exchange with Diamara DeSouza on technology team integration,
Att: 26 1 pgs Exhibit Z- 3/4/24, Acknowledgement of skills and responsibilities transition by Kelly Brashear (not legible),
Att: 27 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 28 2 pgs Proposed Summons