Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 1:24-cv-01423
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Jill Reginold
Defendant
Vonachen Services Inc
Plaintiff
Stephen Michael Furjes, Jr
213 Connecticut St
Washington, IL 61571


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Fri 04/25 4:32 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/25/2025. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Hanna for further proceedings.(LN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
order Order Removing JEH as MJ Re DJ Hawley Apt Sun 11/17 2:59 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Jill Reginold, Vonachen Services Inc. Originals sent to plaintiff to effect service. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 9:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Jill Reginold, Vonachen Services Inc (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by Stephen Michael Furjes, Jr. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Filing Fee Receipt