Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jane Triche Milazzo
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:24-cv-02567
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12181 Title III Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 4:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Kessler
Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
Leopold Z. Sher
Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
James M. Garner
Sher Garner Cahill Richter Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Kessler
Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
Leopold Z. Sher
Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
James M. Garner
Sher Garner Cahill Richter Klein & Hilbert, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Geraldine Watkins
Represented By
Eva Milberg Kalikoff
Bizer & Dereus, LLC
contact info
Garret S DeReus
Bizer & Dereus
contact info
Andrew David Bizer
Bizer & Dereus, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 01/10 11:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion/Stipulation to Dismiss Case, with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/10/2025. (sa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/09 10:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Geraldine Watkins(Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/16 5:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C., Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Garner, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/22 9:38 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to Omni Hotels Management Corporation answer due 12/16/2024; Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C. answer due 12/16/2024. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/22/2024. (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/21 2:59 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C., Omni Hotels Management Corporation.Attorney James M. Garner added to party Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft).(Garner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/04 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Omni Hotels Management Corporation served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Riverfront Lodging, L.L.C.(gla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/29 12:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cmi)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10751019) filed by Geraldine Watkins.Attorney Andrew David Bizer added to party Geraldine Watkins(pty:pla).(Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons