Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 5:24-cv-00243
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/19 1:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff filed a motion to voluntarily dismiss his civil-rights complaint. Dkt. No.6 . Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) permits a plaintiff to dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves an answer. The Court finds that Plaintiff's motion serves as a self-executing notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a). The Clerk is directed to close this case and terminate any pending motions. Plaintiff is advised that if he refiles his complaint, he must submit his complaint on the court-approved form for prisoner civil-rights cases, and he must pay the $405.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified statement of his inmate trust account. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/19/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 11/19 10:04 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by J. Nicholas Bryant. (bmh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2024) (bmh).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Clerk's correspondence letter
misc Order Receipt Tue 11/19 1:25 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Nov 19 13:25:48 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 11/19 1:27 PM
Civil Case Close per Order 7 . (bmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 3 pgs misc Public Correspondence Received Tue 11/05 9:41 AM
Public correspondence filed, deputy clerk response attached, received from J. Nicholas Bryant. (krr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Clerk's Correspondence Letter
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Fri 11/01 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER : J. Nicholas Bryant must address the following deficiency: The Court find that Petitioner should, within 30 day from the date of this order, pay the filing fee of 405.00 or file the following document with the Clerk: [ X] A signed form application to proceed IFP; [X] A certified copy of his in mat trust account statement. Clerk mailed an application to proceed IFP to Petitioner along with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/1/2024) (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 11/01 11:54 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. clerk mailed an application to proceed IFP to Petitioner along with a copy of this order. Fri Nov 1 11:54:54 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 10/29 1:09 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Hendrix Tue 10/29 1:08 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) (bmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Tue 10/29 1:05 PM
Petition For Writ of Mandamus filed by J. Nicholas Bryant. (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 10/29 1:09 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3. Tue Oct 29 13:09:55 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]