Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Referred: Edward B Atkins
Case #: 5:24-cv-00310
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Dale Allen
Represented By
Jonathan Matthew Gifford
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Derrick T. Wright
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Edward Barnes
Represented By
Jonathan Matthew Gifford
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Derrick T. Wright
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Lockard
Represented By
Jonathan Matthew Gifford
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Derrick T. Wright
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Powell County Fiscal Court
Represented By
Jonathan Matthew Gifford
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Derrick T. Wright
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Townsend
Represented By
James N. O'Toole
Smith O'Toole & Brooke - Lexington
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER:1. The defendants' motion to dismiss 4 is GRANTED regarding pltf Townsend's claims under Title VII against Dale Allen, Michael Townsend, and Michael Lockard, GRANTED regarding pltf Townsend's claims for tortious interference w/ business & relationships against all dfts, and GRANTED re: pltf Townsend's claims for punitive damage against all dft's;2. The dft's motion to dismiss 4 is DENIED regarding pltf Townsend's claims under Title VII against the Powell County Fiscal Court and DENIED re: pltf Townsend's claims under the Kentucky Civil Rights Act against all dfts. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/24/2025.(KCF)cc: COR

Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Deadline Mon 04/28 1:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Within 14 days, parties to exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1) not previously previously exchanged; 2. Plaintiff disclose expert witnesses by 10/28/2025, Defendant disclose same by 12/9/2025; 3. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due within 30 days of discovery of new information but by NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; 4. Discovery due by 1/20/2026; 5 All discovery disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to standing orders of the Court (Edward B. Atkins); 6. Motions for extension of time referred to undersigned. Parties are advised such motions are not favored & must be accompanied by a memorandum & affidavit of counsel outlining sufficient grounds for granting the relief sought; 7. Parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines in this Scheduling order or for responding to motions as required by Local Rule 7.1(c); 8. Motions to Amend Pleadings or to Join Additional Parties due by 8/28/2025; 9. Dispositive Motions and daubert motions due by 2/20/2026; 10. By 5/26/2026, counsel file: a. witness lists, b. exhibit lists, c. pretrial memorandum; 11. By 6/26/2026, counsel pre-mark & number all exhibits & exchange with opposing counsel; 12. Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions due by 6/9/2026; 13. Objections to use of depositions or to the admissibility of exhibits due by 6/16/2026; 14. Above listed pretrial filings may be submitted to chambers by email listed herein; 15. NLT 6/16/2026, parties submit to chambers a copy of each exhibit; 16. JURY TRIAL set for 6/30/2026 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before District Judge Danny C Reeves, counsel present at 8:30 a.m. (3 days); 17. Parties may request a PTC as appropriate closer to the date set for trial; 19, Parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator if they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 4/28/2025.(KM)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 04/28 11:37 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gifford, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
utility File Submitted Tue 04/08 10:09 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review:11 Answer to Complaint (KCF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 10:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Dale Allen, Edward Barnes, Michael Lockard, Powell County Fiscal Court.(Gifford, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Mon 03/24 8:57 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT:1. W/in 30 days, counsel to conduct meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f);2. At the time of the meeting, counsel to exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1);3. W/in 14 days after the meeting, counsel for parties to file a written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/24/2025.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Forms
9 9 13 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Mon 03/24 8:51 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER:1. The defendants' motion to dismiss4 is GRANTED regarding pltf Townsend's claims under Title VII against Dale Allen, Michael Townsend, and Michael Lockard, GRANTED regarding pltf Townsend's claims for tortious interference w/ business & relationships against all dfts, and GRANTED re: pltf Townsend's claims for punitive damage against all dft's;2. The dft's motion to dismiss4 is DENIED regarding pltf Townsend's claims under Title VII against the Powell County Fiscal Court and DENIED re: pltf Townsend's claims under the Kentucky Civil Rights Act against all dfts. Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 3/24/2025.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 10 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/10 5:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard filed by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard.(Gifford, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Michael W. Townsend, EEOC Charge of Discrimination
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 8 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/03 5:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard filed by Michael Townsend.(O'Toole, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit in support
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Terminate Motions Mon 12/23 8:48 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to extend the deadline [Record No.5 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss [Record No.4 ] is extended through Friday, January 3, 2025. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/20/24.(JLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 12/20 6:33 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO James O'Toole re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Michael Townsend; ERROR: Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing," file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (JLM)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Fri 12/20 12:27 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard by Michael Townsend (JLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/19 5:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard by Michael Townsend (O'Toole, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Fri 12/13 7:14 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re4 MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard (JLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 11/21 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Powell County Fiscal Court, Edward Barnes, Dale Allen, Michael Lockard(Gifford, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 11/21 4:53 PM
Attorney Update. Attorney Derrick T. Wright for Dale Allen,Derrick T. Wright for Edward Barnes,Derrick T. Wright for Michael Lockard,Derrick T. Wright for Powell County Fiscal Court added. (JLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 10/29 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Dale Allen, Edward Barnes, Michael Lockard, Powell County Fiscal Court and returned to counsel electronically for service.(KMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Conflict Check Tue 10/29 9:05 AM
Conflict Check run. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 8:58 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5957456), filed by Michael Townsend.(KMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Lockard,
Att: 2 Summons Allen,
Att: 3 Summons Barnes,
Att: 4 Summons Powell County