Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:24-cv-00968
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:2410 Quiet Title
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
United States of America The
Represented By
Herbert West Linder
Doj-Tax
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Schwalbe
P. O. Box 366
Muenster, TX 76252
Represented By
Justin Ryan Landgraf
Republic Law Group
contact info
Jesse Chapel
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Schwalbe Trucks, Inc.
P. O. Box 366
Muenster, TX 76252
Represented By
Justin Ryan Landgraf
Republic Law Group
contact info
Jesse Chapel
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 05/13 4:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2026 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Mediation Completion due by 11/26/2025. Designation of Mediator due by 10/15/2025. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 11/19/2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/13/2025. (baf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 05/06 4:15 PM
NOTICE: The Rule 16 management conference set for 5/14/2025 is cancelled. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 04/17 10:21 AM
FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Landgraf, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Thu 03/13 11:49 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/18/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 5/14/2025 at 04:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/13/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/06 3:15 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Schwalbe Trucks, Inc., Dennis Schwalbe . (Landgraf, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 02/20 10:33 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by United States of America The.(Linder, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/20 1:55 PM
ORDER granting re6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Schwalbe Trucks, Inc. Answer due 2/20/2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/20/2024. (baf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/19 10:57 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by United States of America The.(Linder, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 05, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schwalbe Trucks, Inc., Dennis Schwalbe. All Defendants. (Landgraf, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/14 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Chapel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10486522. (Chapel, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 10/29 2:04 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America The. (baf)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 10/29 1:18 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Schwalbe Trucks, Inc. (Landgraf, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America The ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10446747.), filed by Schwalbe Trucks, Inc., Dennis Schwalbe. (Landgraf, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Liens,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Form 9423,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/29 1:36 PM
Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 10/29 1:36 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf)
Related: [-]