Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01060
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc.
Represented By
Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 order Continue Hearing (Order) Wed 04/30 4:54 PM
Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Motion To Continue Deadline to Submit an Agreed Scheduling Order. Related [+] Signed on 4/30/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 motion Continue Hearing Tue 04/29 10:12 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Hearing On Deadline to Submit Scheduling Order Related [+] Filed by Albert J. Derbes IV of The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C., Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Att: 1 Draft Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 order Continue Hearing (Order) (AP) Fri 04/11 2:21 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Joint ExParte Motion to Continue Deadline to Submit an Agreed Scheduling Order Related [+] Signed on 4/11/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray, Defendant Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc.
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 motion Continue Hearing (Motion) (AP) Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On Joint ExParte Motion to Continue Deadline to Submit an Agreed Scheduling Order Filed by Dwayne M. Murray, Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)14 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/26 4:52 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 3/26/25 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,13 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Trustee Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray, Defendant Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc., Motion to Extend Time
utility Set/Reset/Satisfy Other Deadline(s) (AP) Wed 03/26 4:56 PM
Deadline(s) Satisfie Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 11 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference,14 Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Mon 02/10 4:30 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial on , in addition to Joint Motion to Extend Time to Submit Scheduling Order or Schedule a Status Conference Filed by Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray, Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/10 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)11 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference) Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference (Order) Tue 01/07 12:31 PM
Order Continuing Trial. Signed on January 7, 2025 Related [+] Trial scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. Discovery due by 4/17/2025. (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-] 4 Order,10 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Monday, January 06, 2025
10 10 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Mon 01/06 2:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial on Joint Ex Parte Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Mon 12/23 11:20 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. (Derbes, Albert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 order Extend Time (Order) Thu 12/05 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 12/5/24. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Thu 12/05 2:38 PM
Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 12/23/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 motion 03Extend Time Mon 12/02 5:08 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file Responsive Pleadings and Scheduling Order Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Draft Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:30 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/29 2:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. 10/29/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Tue 10/29 9:10 AM
Summons Issued on Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 4:15 PM
Adversary case 24-01060 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 548, and 550 and Objection to Claim 35 by Dwayne M. Murray against Securitas Security Services, USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet