Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-32031

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bankruptcy Jud Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:24-ap-03089
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Synergi Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Synergi Partners, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel
Represented By
Conor White
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
court Close adversary case Tue 03/11 9:22 AM
Adversary case 3:24-ap-3089 closed (Billings, Emma)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 03/10 7:58 PM
Joint Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Wed 10/30 9:16 AM
Summons service executed on Synergi Partners, Inc. 10/30/2024 (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Tue 10/29 3:50 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 4/14/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. Trial will be held during the week of 4/21/2025. (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
2 2 court Summons issued Tue 10/29 3:47 PM
Summons issued on Synergi Partners, Inc., Answer Due 12/2/2024; (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 3:51 PM
Adversary case 24-03089 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against Synergi Partners, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). 13 Related [+]. 14. (White, Conor)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet