Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:24-cv-01487
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION
Represented By
Christopher Bouriat
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Brianna Schmid
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCHELE ANDREWS
Represented By
Justin Michael Bahorich, I
J.P. Ward & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 adr Notice of Mediation Tue 04/08 7:46 PM
Notice of Mediation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Mediation Date June 11, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/07 12:24 PM
ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Engage in ADR19 . The parties shall complete the ADR process they selected by June 11, 2025. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for April 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled to June 18, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file any amended Rule 26(f) Report and their joint pre-conference statement by June 13, 2025. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/7/25. (cjo)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extend Time Mon 04/07 11:34 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Engage in ADR by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/31 4:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 03/31 4:51 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Thu 03/06 2:04 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 1:57 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 4/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information can be found at ECF16 . ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 3/31/2025. Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 4/9/2025. Details and Deadlines more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/6/25. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR,
Att: 2 2: Rule 26(f) form
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/03 4:58 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/28 11:23 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION shall have until March 3, 2025 to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/28/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/28 10:52 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:43 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MARCHELE ANDREWS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION served on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/31/2025. (Bahorich, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/06 5:37 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION Answer due from THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION on 1/31/2025. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 12/06 5:35 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Schmid on behalf of THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Schmid, Brianna)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Bouriat on behalf of THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION. (Bouriat, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 3:19 PM
ORDER re 12(b) Motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/5/2024. (cjo)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 11/05 3:18 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 4:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION, filed by MARCHELE ANDREWS. (Bahorich, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Wed 10/30 4:40 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by MARCHELE ANDREWS. Reason for Correction: Signature. (Bahorich, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 11:26 AM
Summons Issued as to THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION (rjr)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/30 11:22 AM
Judge Robert J. Colville added. (rjr)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No signature s/ Wed 10/30 11:25 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
1 1 24 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Tue 10/29 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8532807), filed by MARCHELE ANDREWS. (Bahorich, Justin) Main document restricted from public view and refiled correctly at3 ERRATA. Modified text on 10/31/2024. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons