Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Theresa L Springmann
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00388
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Walgreens Co
Represented By
Edward W Hearn
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
Alejandra M Greavu
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Debra Y Irby
Represented By
Douglas E Sakaguchi
Pfeifer Morgan & Stesiak
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 01/16 12:03 PM
ORDER: Upon review of the report10 , the Court hereby ORDERS Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 11/24/2025; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 2/21/2025; Defendant's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 3/28/2025; The deadline to complete all fact and expert discovery is 5/22/2026; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendant by 1/23/2026; Defendant's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 3/27/2026; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 4/24/2026; The deadline for parties to review and return either the consent to or the declination of the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge is extended to 2/6/2025. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for January 23, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/16/25. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 01/15 12:22 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Greavu, Alejandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 11/19 3:51 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/19 3:51 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 1/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2024. (smb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Tue 11/19 3:46 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/19/2024. (smb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 11/09 1:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreens Co.(Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/30 7:57 AM
Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/29 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra M Greavu on behalf of Walgreens Co (Greavu, Alejandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/29 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Hearn on behalf of Walgreens Co (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 10/29 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5726822.) from St. Joseph Circuit Court - St. Joseph County, Cause No. 71D04-2409-CT-000434, filed by Walgreens Co.(Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit State Court Record
Monday, September 23, 2024
5 5 misc Jury Demand Wed 10/30 7:54 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walgreens Co filed in St. Joseph Superior Court, 71D04-2409-CT-000434, filed by Walgreens Co.(ash)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 cmp State Court Complaint Wed 10/30 7:52 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in St. Joseph Superior Court, 71D04-2409-CT-000434 against Walgreens Co, filed by Debra Y Irby.(ash)
Related: [-]