California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:24-cv-02358
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated
Represented By
Clifford A Clancey
Zelms Erlich Lenkov And Manning
contact info
Tracey Miller
Zelms Erlich Lenkov And Mack
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristi Williamson
Represented By
William D. Marler
Marler Clark, Inc. Ps
contact info
Ilana Korchia
Marler Clark, Inc., Ps
contact info
Frederic L Gordon
Frederic Gordon Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
25 25 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/03 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. This case is set for trial before the Honorable John W. Holcomb in Courtroom 9D, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California. Jury Trial set for Monday, 02/02/2026 at 9:00 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference [L.R. 16] set for Friday, 01/16/2026 at 1:00 p.m. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.] (es)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Mon 02/03 11:31 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/24/25. (cla)
Related: [-]
23 23 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 02/03 7:15 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on February 14, 2025, is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. Plaintiff's Request to Remotely Attend Hearing [ECF No. 22] is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 misc Miscellaneous Document Fri 01/31 3:23 PM
Declaration of Fred Gordon(Marler, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
21 21 misc Exhibit (non-trial) Fri 01/31 3:15 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. as to Status Report20 . (Marler, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Wed 01/29 1:44 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Scheduling Report filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. (Marler, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 01/07 10:21 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 2:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Clancey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 01/06 10:25 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 01/03 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Speath to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:24-cv-02358 JWH(DFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/02 3:47 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition9 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated.(Clancey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 3:08 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Ilana P. Korchia's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristi Williamson, designating Frederic L. Gordon as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/02 3:06 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney William D. Marler's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristi Williamson, designating Frederic L. Gordon as local counsel. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/25 8:35 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ilana P. Korchia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristi Williamson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38651046) filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. (Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/25 8:32 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kristi Williamson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38651025) filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. (Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/13 10:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Clifford A. Clancy. (Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
9 9 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 11/13 10:05 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson(Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/05 1:24 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tracey Miller counsel for Defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated. Adding Tracey Miller as counsel of record for The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated. (Attorney Tracey Miller added to party The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated(pty:dft))(Miller, Tracey)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 11/05 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated, (Clancey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 11/05 1:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Clifford A Clancey counsel for Defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated. Adding Clifford A. Clancey as counsel of record for The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated. (Attorney Clifford A Clancey added to party The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated(pty:dft))(Clancey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/01 5:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson, identifying Kristi Williamson. (Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/01 8:47 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Fri 11/01 8:46 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/29 9:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. (Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/29 9:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38490944 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Kristi Williamson. (Attorney Frederic L Gordon added to party Kristi Williamson(pty:pla))(Gordon, Frederic)
Related: [-]