California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:24-cv-07396
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Datanyze, LLC
Represented By
Martin Roth
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Max Samels
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Rachel Haig
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Camil Sanchez-Palumbo
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Robyn Eileen Bladow
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Burgy
Represented By
Wallace Cyril Solberg
Anderson And Wanca
contact info
S. Chandler Visher
Law Offices Of S. C. Visher
contact info
Plaintiff
Michaela Foley
Represented By
Wallace Cyril Solberg
Anderson And Wanca
contact info
S. Chandler Visher
Law Offices Of S. C. Visher
contact info
Plaintiff
James Hurd
Represented By
Wallace Cyril Solberg
Anderson And Wanca
contact info
S. Chandler Visher
Law Offices Of S. C. Visher
contact info
Plaintiff
Cornelius Lewis
Represented By
Wallace Cyril Solberg
Anderson And Wanca
contact info
S. Chandler Visher
Law Offices Of S. C. Visher
contact info
Plaintiff
John Soots
Represented By
Wallace Cyril Solberg
Anderson And Wanca
contact info
S. Chandler Visher
Law Offices Of S. C. Visher
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 13, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/13 2:41 PM
ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 24 Stipulation. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/13 5:29 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Cornelius Lewis, Robert Burgy, Michaela Foley, John Soots, James Hurd.(Solberg, Wallace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 19, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/19 7:30 PM
ORDER EXTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES, AND EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER DUE DATE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 22 Stipulation. Initial Case Management Conference will be held via Zoom Webinar. Deadline to File ADR Certification and to Meet & Confer Re: Initial Disclosures, Early Settlement, ADR Process Selection, and Discovery Plan due by 2/20/2025. Joint Case Management Statement and Initial Disclosures due by 3/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. Parties' notice if the new time does not work with their calendar and a list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 14, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/19 12:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Cornelius Lewis, Robert Burgy, Michaela Foley, John Soots, James Hurd.(Solberg, Wallace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 12:10 PM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Wallace Solberg). (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 6:44 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice -Wallace C. Solberg ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20154184.) filed by Cornelius Lewis, Robert Burgy, Michaela Foley, John Soots, James Hurd.(Solberg, Wallace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing
Friday, December 06, 2024
19 19 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/06 7:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michaela Foley (Visher, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:06 AM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Camil Sanchez-Palumbo). (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:04 AM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Max Samels). (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:01 AM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Rachel Haig). (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 9:58 AM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Martin Roth). (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 2:02 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20084518.) filed by Datanyze, LLC.(Sanchez-Palumbo, Camil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 1:59 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20084488.) filed by Datanyze, LLC.(Samels, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 1:55 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20084455.) filed by Datanyze, LLC.(Haig, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 1:52 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20084420.) filed by Datanyze, LLC.(Roth, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 1:45 PM
NOTICE by Datanyze, LLC Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to L.R. 3-13(Bladow, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 11/25 1:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Datanyze, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ZoomInfo Technologies, Inc. for Datanyze, LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 11/25 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Robyn Eileen Bladow on behalf of Datanyze, LLC (Bladow, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 10/31 10:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 24, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/31 6:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michaela Foley. Service waived by Datanyze, LLC waiver sent on 10/31/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Visher, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 1:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Datanyze, LLC. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 10/30 1:35 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 10/29 3:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .File corrected Civil Cover Sheet does not match docket. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: Electronic Filing Error, (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet nature of suit and docket do not match. Refile corrected civil cover sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:2 Complaint filed by michaela foley (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
2 2 COMPLAINT against Datanyze, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19980776.). Filed by michaela foley.(Visher, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 Proposed Summons. (Visher, S.)
Related: [-]