California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-07449
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause11:101 Bankruptcy
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024

Debtor
PG&E Corporation

,
Represented By
Kevin Bostel
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Tobias S. Keller
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
John Nolan
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Scott Reents
contact info
Lee Brand
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Timothy G. Cameron
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Michael J. Reiss
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Matthew Goren
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
David N. Levine
Groom Law Group, Chartered
contact info
Katherine B Kohn
Groom Law Group, Chartered
contact info
David Franklin Hill, IV
Weil, Gotshal And Manges, LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Orsini
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Jane Kim
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Andriana Georgallas
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Stuart J. Goldring
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Theodore Tsekerides
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Richard W. Slack
Weil, Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Peter J. Benvenutti
Keller & Benvenutti LLP
contact info
Dara Levinson Silveira
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Gabrielle L Albert
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Omid H. Nasab
Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP
contact info
James E. Brandt
Latham And Watkins
contact info
David A. Herman
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Paul H. Zumbro
Cravath, Swaine And Moore LLP
contact info
Jessica Liou
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Stephen Karotkin
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Ray C. Schrock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Kevin Kramer
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Appellee
Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico
33 Plaza La Prensa
Santa Fe, NM 87507
Represented By
Michael P. Canty
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr.
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
James Matthew Wagstaffe
Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP
contact info
Defendant
Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info
Defendant
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Paul S. Aronzon
Tweed Hadley & Mccoy LLP
contact info
Dennis F. Dunne
Milbank LLP
contact info
Erin Elizabeth Dexter
Milbank LLP
contact info
James Cornell Behrens
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Andrew Michael Leblanc
Milbank LLP
contact info
Gregory Allan Bray
Milbank LLP
contact info
Alan Joseph Stone
Milbank LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Respondent
RKS Claimants
PENN 1, Suite 3401 One Pennsylvania Plaza
New York, NY 10119
Represented By
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Richard Bodnar
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Frank Thomas More Catalina
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee 450 Golden Gate Ave 5th FL, #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Cameron Gulden
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Timothy S. Laffredi
Office Of The U.S. Trustee-San Jose
contact info
Marta Elena Villacorta
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Jason Blumberg
Office Of The U.S.Trustee
contact info
Lynette C. Kelly
Office Of He United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
GPO Dec 02 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Canty. **Docket No. 12 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 14.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
GPO Dec 02 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr. **Docket No. 13 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 15.**(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2024)
GPO Dec 10 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard Bodnar.**Docket No. 20 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 23.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2024)
GPO Dec 10 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Frank Thomas More Catalina.**Docket No. 21 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 24.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2024)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/10 1:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Frank Thomas More Catalina. **Docket No. 21 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 24 .** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/10 1:01 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard Bodnar. **Docket No. 20 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 23 .** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/10 12:27 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20121700.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/9/2024 filed by RKS Claimants.(Catalina, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NY Certificate of Good Standing
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/10 12:25 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20121680.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/9/2024 filed by RKS Claimants.(Bodnar, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NY Certificate of Good Standing
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 12/10 10:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NOS.20 AND21 . The information on the application must match the docket. Your names and addresses and your local co-counsel's name on the application don't match the docket (your names on the docket: Frank Thomas More Catalina and Richard Bodnar;your addresses on the docket: PENN 1, Suite 3401One Pennsylvania Plaza; and local co-counsel's name on the docket: James Austin Long). Either update the information on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct information reflected on it. If you update the information on the docket, please notify the CRD via e-mail after it's been done. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 9:47 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20121700.) filed by RKS Claimants.(Catalina, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NY Certificate of Good Standing
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 9:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20121680.) filed by RKS Claimants.(Bodnar, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NY Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Tue 12/03 6:47 PM
RESPONSE re3 Received Document Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Leave to Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by RKS Claimants. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Tue 12/03 4:44 PM
RESPONSE to3 Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Leave to Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Canty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 8:09 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas Gregory Hoffman, Jr. **Docket No. 13 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 15 .** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 8:06 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Canty. **Docket No. 12 TERMINATED, Re-Filed as Docket No. 14 .** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:28 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20032367.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2024 filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Hoffman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:26 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20031521.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2024 filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Canty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 9:26 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20032367.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2024 filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Hoffman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 8:50 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20031521.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2024 filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Canty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
utility Terminate Motions Wed 11/27 9:27 AM
***8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael Patrick Canty TERMINATED, Re-filed as Docket No.12 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 11/14 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 11/08 12:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NOS.8 and9 . The information on the application must match the docket. Your name on the application doesn't match the docket. Either update the information on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct information reflected on it. If you update the information on the docket, please notify the CRD via e-mail after it's been done. Your local counsel needs to enter a notice of appearance and add himself to the docket as part of the e-filing process. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 11:34 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Thomas G. Hoffman, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20032367.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Hoffman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 10:46 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael Patrick Canty ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20031521.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2024 filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico.(Canty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/06 8:59 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/05 7:34 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Bankruptcy Appeal Stipulation to Extend Deadline and [Proposed] Order filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Canty, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/04 5:16 PM
ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES re 4 Notice of Lodging of Administrative Motion. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2024. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/30 8:57 PM
NOTICE by PG&E Corporation (Notice of Lodging of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related) Related [+]
Related: [-] iss, Michael
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 misc Received Document Tue 10/29 3:58 PM
Transmission of Documents on Appeal by PG&E Corporation.(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal Motion
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 appeal Initial Case Management Scheduling Order Bankruptcy Case Tue 10/29 3:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 10/29 3:09 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088 File received. Filed by PG&E Corporation.(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet