California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 4:24-cv-07489
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
6Sense Insights, Inc.
Represented By
Chirag Haresh Patel
Clark Hill LLP
contact info
Myriah Jaworski
Clark Hill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Ambrozewicz
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Clarissa R. Olivares
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Michael Loren Silverman
The Bruno Firm LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Blair Elizabeth Reed
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Bell
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Devin Franke
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Madeline Garcia
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Hartz
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Lamonica
Represented By
Matthew B. George
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Klint L. Bruno
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jennifer Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
The Bruno Firm
contact info
Jennifer H. Gelman
The Bruno Firm, LLC
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 11/14 5:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/14 4:01 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 6Sense Insights, Inc... (Jaworski, Myriah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/13 8:39 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by 6Sense Insights, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/13 9:09 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20042738.) filed by Michael Ambrozewicz, Devin Franke, Matthew Hartz, Nicole Lamonica, Edward Bell, Madeline Garcia.(Silverman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/07 4:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Ambrozewicz, Devin Franke, Matthew Hartz, Nicole Lamonica, Edward Bell, Madeline Garcia (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/06 4:51 PM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 8 Jennifer H. Gelman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/06 5:03 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20022100.) filed by Michael Ambrozewicz, Devin Franke, Matthew Hartz, Nicole Lamonica, Edward Bell, Madeline Garcia.(Gelman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Illinois Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 4:50 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Ambrozewicz, Devin Franke, Matthew Hartz, Nicole Lamonica, Edward Bell, Madeline Garcia.. (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/31 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Garcia, Nicole Lamonica, Michael Ambrozewicz, Matthew Hartz, Devin Franke, Edward Bell. 6Sense Insights, Inc. served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to 6Sense Insights, Inc.. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 10/29 9:20 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 10/29 8:20 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs COMPLAINT against 6Sense Insights, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19994004.). Filed by Madeline Garcia, Nicole Lamonica, Michael Ambrozewicz, Matthew Hartz, Devin Franke, Edward Bell.(King, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet