Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-24228
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Milagro Elizabeth Cooper
Represented By
Michael Anthony Pancier
Michael A. Pancier, P.A.
contact info
Michael R. Hayden
Unite The People, Inc.
contact info
Mediator
Scott J. Silverman
JAMS 600 Brickell Ave Suite 2600
Miami, FL 33131
Plaintiff
Megan Pete
Represented By
Olga M. Vieira
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Marie Hayrapetian
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Mari Henderson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Daniel L. Humphrey
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Robert Schwartz
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Julian Schoen
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
69 69 notice NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) Tue 04/22 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING : re 64 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing : Discovery Hearing set for 4/23/2025 11:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Zoom Information: Meeting ID: 161 516 6912; Passcode: 021552. (mka) (mka)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
68 68 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan Pete re66 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Svc of Dkts 65 & 66 ; Personal Service of Daystar Peterson (Humphrey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
67 67 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan Pete re66 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Proof of Mail Service to California Correctional Institute Tehachapi (Humphrey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
66 66 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 04/17 10:51 AM
ORDER granting65 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Daystar Peterson's Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2025. Plaintiff has until April 21, 2025 to file a notice of service showing she served Mr. Peterson with a copy of this Order and her Motion [ECF No.[ 65]]. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
65 65 motion Show Cause Wed 04/16 6:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Daystar Peterson Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating This Court's Order Permitting His Deposition by Megan Pete.(Humphrey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - M&C Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Instagram Post,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Deposition,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order