New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-10152
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Notice for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of NJ, Atlantic County, Law Div., ATL-L-31-00024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC PARTNERSHIPS
Represented By
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE I-V
Represented By
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MARY DOE I-V
Represented By
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
XYZ CORPORATIONS
Represented By
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CAROLE DOWD
Represented By
MICHAEL J. MACKLER
Goldberg, Mackler, Sayegh, Mintz, Pfeffer, Bonchi & Gill, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD DOWD
Represented By
MICHAEL J. MACKLER
Goldberg, Mackler, Sayegh, Mintz, Pfeffer, Bonchi & Gill, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY
Terminated: 02/03/2025
Represented By
GIACOMO FRANCESCO GATTUSO
Sweeney & Sheehan
contact info
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC
Terminated: 04/08/2025
Represented By
GIACOMO FRANCESCO GATTUSO
Sweeney & Sheehan
contact info
BRETT ERIC FELDMAN
Sweeney & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/08 1:02 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Boardwalk Regency, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/8/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 04/07 2:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC. (FELDMAN, BRETT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 03/04 1:07 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/3/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 03/03 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2025. Case reported settled, 60 day order to be entered. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 order Order Mon 02/03 1:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on February 3, 2025; and Defendant having requested a stay of discovery in light of the settlement conference scheduled for March 3, 2025; and Plaintiffs consenting to this request; it is hereby ORDERED that discovery is STAYED pending the outcome of the settlement conference. Defendant's representative, Christine Viggiano, may also participate in the settlement conference remotely. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/3/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 10:27 AM
CONSENT ORDER AMENDING CASE CAPTION: Boardwalk Regency, LLC will hereby be substituted as the correct Defendant in this matter, replacing Caesar's Atlantic City; Dismissing Caesars Atlantic City from the case, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/3/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 02/03 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/3/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 misc Proposed Order Fri 01/31 2:01 PM
Proposed Order Consent Order Amending Case Caption by CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY. (GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
12 12 order Order Tue 01/21 2:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received and reviewed the parties' joint letter request [ECF No. 11]; it is hereby ORDERED that an in-person settlement conference is scheduled for March 3, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. All counsel shall report to the Mitchell H. Cohen Building & U.S. Courthouse, 4th & Cooper Streets, Courtroom 3B, Camden, NJ 08101. Counsel are advised that the Court requires the client(s) and an agent or person with full settlement authority to attend the conference. Moreover, prior to the conference, all parties shall have exchanged initial demands and/or settlement offers. All parties shall follow the Judge's preferences for submitting settlement memoranda. Each party shall submit a settlement memorandum to the Court by email at least three (3) business days before the scheduled conference. The memorandum shall not exceed five (5) pages, including exhibits. If additional exhibits are desired, the parties may offer them during the conference. Email memoranda to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/21/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Fri 01/17 4:02 PM
Letter from Brett E. Feldman, Esquire. (GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT ERIC FELDMAN on behalf of All Defendants (FELDMAN, BRETT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Mon 12/23 12:36 PM
Letter from Plaintiff. (MACKLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/03 2:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID 180 549 186# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 7/31/2025. If expert discovery will be served, dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than 12/3/2025. If expert discovery will not be served, dispositive motions shall be filed by 9/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/3/2024. (lm, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 12/03 1:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/3/2024. Scheduling Order to be entered. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 11/27 9:10 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY.(GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 order Order Mon 11/25 2:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. The plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/25/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 order Order Fri 11/01 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on December 3, 2024 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 579 929 120# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/1/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Thu 10/31 11:18 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/31/2024. (aji, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/31 11:15 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY. (GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 10/31 9:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption; Parties should be listed the exact way they appear on the complaint. Failure to do so will result in the caption generating incorrectly. Party Information; Parties should be listed the exact way they appear on the complaint. Alias information should be entered in the alias field. Removal-Other Court Information; Format of State Court case number should appear as close to the original as possible. Be sure to include every digit, even the 0s. Do NOT include the dashes, as referenced in the Notice of Removal workflow . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/31 9:37 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sms2)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 10/31 9:38 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 10/30 10:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC ("IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS "CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY"). (GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/30 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC ("IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS "CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY") from Atlantic County Superior Court, case number ATL-L-2031-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15772311), filed by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC ("IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS "CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY").(GATTUSO, GIACOMO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Certification Certificate of Filing and Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-E
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/30 5:03 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw )
Related: [-]