Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Sally J Berens
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:24-cv-01137
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:17 AM EDT
counter-claimant
Robert Moylan
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
counter-claimant
Sara Moylan
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
counter-claimant
SheFit Operating Company, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
counter-defendant
Angel Ilagan
Represented By
Sarah S. Prescott
Salvatore Prescott Porter & Porter, Pllc (mi)
contact info
Annemarie Smith-Morris
Salvatore Prescott Porter & Porter, Pllc (mi)
contact info
defendant
ZRG Partners, LLC
Represented By
Caryn J. Devaney
The Hanover Law Group
contact info
intervenor-defendant
Robert Moylan
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
intervenor-defendant
Sara Moylan
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
intervenor-defendant
SheFit Operating Company, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info
intervenor-plaintiff
Angel Ilagan
Represented By
Sarah S. Prescott
Salvatore Prescott Porter & Porter, Pllc (mi)
contact info
Annemarie Smith-Morris
Salvatore Prescott Porter & Porter, Pllc (mi)
contact info
plaintiff
SheFit Operating Company, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan B. Frank
Frank And Frank Law
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2025
ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Ray Kent recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 cmp Counterclaim Mon 04/21 10:26 AM
COUNTERCLAIM against Angel Ilagan filed by SheFit Operating Company, LLC, Robert Moylan, Sara Moylan (Frank, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/21/2025 (eod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 motion Dismiss Thu 04/17 6:05 PM
MOTION to dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), Brief in Support by intervenor-defendants SheFit Operating Company, LLC, Robert Moylan, Sara Moylan; (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
32 32 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/17 11:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angel Ilagan as to Robert Moylan waiver sent on 2/16/2025, answer due 4/17/2025; Sara Moylan waiver sent on 2/16/2025, answer due 4/17/2025; SheFit Operating Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/16/2025, answer due 4/17/2025 (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
31 31 service Summons Issued Thu 02/13 12:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to intervenor-defendant SheFit Operating Company, LLC (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
30 30 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Wed 02/12 3:21 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re27 (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
29 29 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 3:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to intervenor-defendants Robert Moylan, Sara Moylan (mlc)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 02/06 2:07 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re27 (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
service Summons Not Issued Wed 02/05 1:39 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to intervenor-defendants Robert Moylan, Sara Moylan (summons not provided) (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
27 27 cmp Intervenor Complaint Tue 02/04 1:18 PM
INTERVENOR COMPLAINT and jury demand filed by Angel Ilagan (mlc) Modified text on 2/4/2025; filed per order26 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Mon 02/03 10:26 AM
ORDER granting9 Plaintiff Intervenor Angel Ilagan's Motion to Intervene; the Clerk shall docket the proposed intervention complaint [9-1]; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
25 25 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case Thu 01/23 11:51 AM
NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings pursuant to Order 24 by Judge Ray Kent ; Judge Ray Kent no longer assigned to the case (mg)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 01/23 10:44 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Ray Kent recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 9:38 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint19 with affirmative defenses and reliance on Jury Demand by ZRG Partners, LLC (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
22 22 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/10 6:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by intervenor Angel Ilagan re Reply to Response to Motion21 (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/10 6:00 PM
REPLY to response to motion9 ( 13 Plaintiff's opposition to proposed intervenor's motion to intervene) filed by Angel Ilagan (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Fri 01/10 11:44 AM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 1/22/2025 at 10:30 AM; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference rescheduled to 1/23/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/07 11:09 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against ZRG Partners, LLC filed by SheFit Operating Company, LLC (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposal and Search Agreement
18 18 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Tue 01/07 10:24 AM
NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 1/13/2025 at 10:00 AM; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference rescheduled to 1/22/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs misc Order Transferring Case to Magistrate Judge Upon Consent Tue 01/07 9:56 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge; Magistrate Judge Ray Kent now presiding; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Tue 01/07 9:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER permitting plaintiff to file first amended complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Mon 01/06 3:39 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 01/03 10:43 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint by plaintiff SheFit Operating Company, LLC (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response in Opposition Fri 01/03 10:04 AM
RESPONSE in opposition to PROPOSED MOTION to intervene9 filed by SheFit Operating Company, LLC (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses
Thursday, January 02, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 2:42 PM
ORDER striking11 amended complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/31 11:29 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against ZRG Partners, LLC filed by SheFit, Inc. (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, December 27, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 12/27 12:34 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sarah S. Prescott on behalf of intervenor Angel Ilagan (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 12/27 12:36 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Annemarie Smith-Morris on behalf of intervenor Angel Ilagan (Smith-Morris, Annemarie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
10 10 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Fri 12/20 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re PROPOSED MOTION to intervene9 filed by intervenor Angel Ilagan (Prescott, Sarah) Modified text on 12/20/2024 (eod)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Intervene Fri 12/20 1:33 PM
PROPOSED MOTION to intervene by intervenor Angel Ilagan; (Prescott, Sarah) Modified text on 12/20/2024 (eod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone Wed 11/20 10:52 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 1/13/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 1/8/2025; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 10:14 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZRG Partners, LLC (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 9:33 AM
ORDER that defendant ZRG Partners, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 10:16 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by ZRG Partners, LLC (Devaney, Caryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 1:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SheFit, Inc. (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 11:53 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant ZRG Partners, LLC (mlc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 10/30 11:50 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against ZRG Partners, LLC filed by SheFit, Inc. (Frank, Jonathan) Modified text on 10/30/2024 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement,
Att: 2 Summons
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 10/30 11:22 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff SheFit, Inc. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7526680 (Frank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]