Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-bk-09234
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CAPITAL COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS LLC
10287 E. DIAMOND DR.
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85255
Represented By
JOSEPH GREGORY URTUZUASTEGUI, III
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
67 67 audio audio Fri 05/02 8:57 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [05/01/2025 10:16:46 AM]. File Size [ 3356 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:59 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
66 66 order oApprove Compromise/Settlement Thu 05/01 4:13 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Related [+] signed on 5/1/2025. (WES)
Related: [-] 58
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - Compromise
65 65 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 05/01 9:32 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report For March 2025 filed by JOSEPH GREGORY URTUZUASTEGUI III on behalf of CAPITAL COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS LLC.(URTUZUASTEGUI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement March 2025 Balance Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement March 2025 DIP Acct Statement
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
64 64 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 04/30 4:24 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JOSEPH GREGORY URTUZUASTEGUI III on behalf of CAPITAL COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS LLC Related [+].(URTUZUASTEGUI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 58 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Exhibit 1 - Compromise
63 63 other Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 12:01 PM
Certificate of Service filed by JOSEPH GREGORY URTUZUASTEGUI III on behalf of CAPITAL COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS LLC. Related [+] (URTUZUASTEGUI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-] 58 Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement