Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-03043

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Pamela W Mcafee
Case #: 5:24-ap-00124
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc.
11635 Northpark Drive Suite 320
Wake Forest, NC 27587
Represented By
Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cromwell Capital, LLC
Bell, Davis & Pitt, P.A. PO Box 21029
Winston-Salem, NC 27120
Represented By
Daniel C. Bruton
Bell Davis & Pitt, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/27 10:12 AM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-124 Closed (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/26 9:44 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc. filed by Daniel C. Bruton on behalf of Cromwell Capital, LLC. (Bruton, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 3:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 3:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] dwine, Rebecca
Thursday, October 31, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/31 12:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc. 10/31/2024. filed by Daniel C. Bruton on behalf of Cromwell Capital, LLC. (Bruton, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 10/30 1:07 PM
Summons Issued on Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc. Answer Due 12/2/2024 (Bruton, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:07 PM
Adversary case 24-00124 5. Complaint by Cromwell Capital, LLC against Family Solutions of Ohio, Inc. (Fee Paid) (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Bruton, Daniel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Wed 10/30 1:10 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint([LINK 24-00124 5-PWM] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18169527, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Wed 10/30 1:18 PM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Roxanne Parker (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Thu 10/31 7:00 AM
Answer due by 12/02/2024 (adi)
Related: [-]