North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:24-cv-00959
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Consol Plaintiff
Jamal Joe
Represented By
William B. Federman
Federman & Sherwood
contact info
Jessica A. Wilkes
Federman & Sherwood
contact info
Scott C. Harris
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Autobell Car Wash, LLC
Represented By
David L. Woodard
Poyner & Spruill
contact info
Timothy J. Lowe, I
Mcdonald Hopkins
contact info
Jeffrey S. Haut
Mcdonald Hopkins, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Reece Pauken
Represented By
Jessica A. Wilkes
Federman & Sherwood
contact info
Mariya Weekes
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Scott C. Harris
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Set Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 10:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Response due by 5/30/2025. (ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
23 23 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/31 2:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Autobell Car Wash, LLC. (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/31 2:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Autobell Car Wash, LLC. Responses due by 4/14/2025 (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/31 1:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Autobell Car Wash, LLC answer due 3/31/2025. (ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 68 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/30 3:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Autobell Car Wash, LLC, filed by Reece Pauken, Jamal Joe.(Wilkes, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Thursday, January 09, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/09 8:22 AM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jessica A. Wilkes for Jamal Joe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 01/08/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/09 8:19 AM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William B. Federman for Jamal Joe. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 01/08/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 01/09 8:23 AM
Notice to Jessica A. Wilkes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/16/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 01/08 4:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jessoca A. Wilkes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6801040. by Jamal Joe. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Wed 01/08 4:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William B. Federman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6801031. by Jamal Joe. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 1:59 PM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Timothy J. Lowe for Autobell Car Wash, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 01/07/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/07 1:55 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey S. Haut for Autobell Car Wash, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 01/07/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Tue 01/07 11:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Lowe Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6796337. by Autobell Car Wash, LLC. (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Tue 01/07 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Haut Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6796324. by Autobell Car Wash, LLC. (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 01/07 1:55 PM
Notice to Jeffrey S. Haut: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/14/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Tue 01/07 1:59 PM
Notice to Timothy J. Lowe: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/14/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 12/31 11:06 AM
ORDER granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:24cv959 only. Member Case: 3:24cv1067 to be administratively closed in case 3:24-cv-00959-MOC-DCK. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/31/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/27 11:37 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mariya Weekes for Reece Pauken (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/27/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Fri 12/27 11:39 AM
Notice to Mariya Weekes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 1/3/2025. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 12/26 5:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mariya Weekes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6782793. by Reece Pauken. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 12/20 1:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 3:24-cv-01067 and Appoint Interim Lead Counsel by Reece Pauken. Responses due by 1/3/2025 (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Milberg Firm Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Federman & Sherwood Firm Resume,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/26 8:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Autobell Car Wash, LLC.(Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Corporate Disclosure Statement
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/25 7:52 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Autobell Car Wash, LLC answer due 1/17/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/22/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/22 4:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Autobell Car Wash, LLC. (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Woodard on behalf of Autobell Car Wash, LLC (Woodard, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/20 3:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reece Pauken. Autobell Car Wash, LLC served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 4:24 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Autobell Car Wash, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 1:53 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Reece Pauken. (Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Autobell Car Wash, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6718927), filed by Reece Pauken.(Harris, Scott)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/30 4:23 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tlj)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Wed 10/30 4:27 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (tlj)
Related: [-]