Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Referred: Grady J Leupold
Case #: 3:24-cv-05912
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 motion Objections to Report and Recommendation Tue 03/11 2:11 PM
OBJECTIONS and Request for Extension of Time by Petitioner Gabriel Indelicio Nevarez to10 Report and Recommendations. Noted by clerk for 3/31/2025. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 02/26 9:39 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned further concludes that no evidentiary hearing is required and no certificate of appealability shall issue. It is therefore recommended the Petition (Dkt.5 ) be DENIED and this action be DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this report to file written objections. The Clerk is directed to set the matter for consideration on March 13, 2025, as noted in the caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. **10 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, January 09, 2025
9 9 misc State Court Record Thu 01/09 7:54 AM
STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Robb Jackson. **PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (Samson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-46
8 8 motion Response to Habeas Petition Thu 01/09 7:51 AM
RESPONSE to5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Robb Jackson. Noting Date 2/6/2025, **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (Samson, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent Robb Jackson. **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (Samson, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Directing Service Tue 11/26 8:37 AM
ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, § 2254 PETITION by e-mail upon Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington. (This Order and5 Petition emailed to WA Attorney General on 11/26/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet
5 5 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 11/26 8:24 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Related [+] filed by Gabriel Indelicio Nevarez. **17 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MW)
Related: [-] ceipt # IFP Granted
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/26 8:23 AM
ORDER granting Petitioner's3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MW) (cc: DOC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/20 2:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Grady J. Leupold filed by Gabriel Indelicio Nevarez. **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 10/30 12:01 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Application,. ***Action Required*** 2241/2254 Filing Fee Not Paid, IFP Blank/Incomplete/Unsigned, Incorrect IFP Form. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/29/2024 to correct IFP application **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Form
1 1 misc Application Wed 10/30 11:59 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Gabriel Indelicio Nevarez. **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Nevarez, Prisoner ID: 409134) (MW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement,
Att: 2 Proposed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus