Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:24-cv-01305
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Bowen
Represented By
Kristin Ellis Berexa
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Elizabeth Grace Patton
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
David Trofa, MD
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
Suny Upstate University Hospital
Defendant
Jerry Speyer
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant Shane Spencer
Represented By
Laura Ellen Bassett
Leitner, Williams, Dooley & Napolitan, PLLC
contact info
Anthony M. Noel
Leitner, Williams, Dooley, And Napolitan, Pllc (nashville)
contact info
Defendant
David M. Smith
Represented By
Kristin Ellis Berexa
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Patrick B. Naylon
City Of Rochester
contact info
Defendant
Florence Pua, MD
Defendant
New York Presbyterian Hospitals
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
William Levin, MD.
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
Letitia James
Defendant
Laurie Holmes
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Defendant
Thomas G. Donlon
Defendant
Mantosh Dewan, MD
Defendant
Natasha N. Desai, MD
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
Daniel DeWolf
Defendant
Nicole Cross
Defendant
Steven J. Corwin, MD
Represented By
Isaac Salomon Lew
Lewis Thomason, P.C. (memphis)
contact info
Defendant
Robert J. Corona, DO
Defendant
Julie Corn
Defendant
William Becker
Defendant
The Preserve Murfreesboro
Represented By
Ashley N. Gold
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Keene Woodbridge Bartley
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Defendant
Tenant Renting Apt. 8203 as of July 2024
Defendant
Tenant Renting Apt. 8102 as of July 2024
Defendant
David Fitts
Represented By
James A. Sigler
Keuler, Kelly, Hutchins, Blankenship & Sigler, LLP
contact info
Thomas Anderton Wiseman, III
Wiseman Ashworth Trauger
contact info
Joseph A. Bleyer
Bleyer And Bleyer
contact info
Defendant
David Crockarell
Represented By
Neil C. Stauffer
City Of Clarksville
contact info
Defendant
Tara Carroll
Represented By
Ashley N. Gold
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Keene Woodbridge Bartley
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Defendant
Capstone Real Estate Investments-MTSU
Represented By
Ashley N. Gold
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Keene Woodbridge Bartley
Schulman, Leroy & Bennett
contact info
Plaintiff
Ikenna Ugochukwu Onwumere
P.O. Box 353
Bowling Green, KY 42102


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
70 70 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/25 4:34 PM
ORDER: This Court does not administer the PACER system and has no role in setting its security standards nor can the Court waive the requirement that Onwumere obtain a PACER account to access the electronic filing system. Accordingly, Onwumere's motion67 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/25/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
69 69 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/25 9:35 AM
Response to Defendant David Smith Reply to Plaintiff's Response to66 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ikenna Ugochukwu Onwumere. (ad)
Related: [-]
68 68 respoth Reply Mon 02/24 3:14 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY/RESPONSE to New York-Presbyterian Hospital Defendants'64 Reply to Plaintiff's57 Response to46 Motion to Dismiss by Ikenna Ugochukwu Onwumere (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
67 67 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/18 4:26 PM
MOTION About Pacer Account Sign Up by Ikenna Ugochukwu Onwumere. (kc)
Related: [-]