Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02840
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:May 19, 2025
Case in other court:Shelby County Circuit Court, CT-10-00024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Choice Hotels International, Inc.
915 Meeting Street Suite 600
North Bethesda, MD 20850
Represented By
Charles D. Dooley
Leitner Williams Dooley & Napolitan
contact info
Lesley Floyd
Leitner, Williams, Dooley & Napolitan
contact info
Miscellaneous
Jamita Swearengen
Shelby County Circuit Court 140 Adams Ave. #324
Memphis, TN 38103
Plaintiff
Chentha Riley
Represented By
David A. McLaughlin
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
18 18 order Judgment Mon 05/19 9:48 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 05/19/2025. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 11:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Chentha Riley. (McLaughlin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 adr Mediation Certification Thu 04/17 1:22 PM
MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Wade, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/20 2:34 PM
NOTICE by Choice Hotels International, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Floyd, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 03/06/2025. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Setting Letter Thu 03/06 1:56 PM
NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, April 20, 2026 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, March 27, 2026. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 3, 2026, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 1:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status/Scheduling Conference, was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 3/6/2025. David A. McLaughlin appeared for the plaintiff(s). Lesley Floyd appeared for the defense. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, April 20, 2026 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, March 27, 2026. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 3, 2026, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (smm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 02/27 1:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Floyd, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 order Order Tue 02/18 12:52 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] The Parties filed a joint stipulation to substitute the defendant. (ECF No. 9.) For good cause shown, the Court respectfully DIRECTS the Clerk to substitute Inovex Hospitality, LLC for the named Defendant, Choice Hotels International, Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 02/18/2025. (mkm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 02/13 9:15 AM
STIPULATION as to Substitution of Parties by Chentha Riley. (McLaughlin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 notice Setting Letter - Teams Tue 01/28 10:26 AM
NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, March 6, 2025 at 1:45 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Parker@tnwd.uscourts.gov at least seven (7) days before the scheduling conference. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/27 12:41 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Choice Hotels International, Inc..(Floyd, Lesley)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley Floyd on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Floyd, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 10/31 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 10/31 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Thu 10/31 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/31 9:39 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (mf)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/30 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Choice Hotels International, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4110-24 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4538144), filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc..(Dooley, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A