Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Case #: 3:24-cv-00766
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Master-Bilt Products, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Clinton Merritt
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Clara Glen Ilkka
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
John C. Scheller
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Christopher Donald Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Defendant
Nor-Lake, Incorporated
Represented By
Samuel Clinton Merritt
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Clara Glen Ilkka
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
John C. Scheller
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Christopher Donald Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Defendant
Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC
Represented By
Samuel Clinton Merritt
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Clara Glen Ilkka
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
John C. Scheller
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Christopher Donald Tomlinson
Moore & Van Allen
contact info
Plaintiff
Kason Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Anna Carr Halsey
Eversheds Sutherland (us) LLP
contact info
Matthew J. Duchemin
Quarles & Brady
contact info
Ronald Zdrojeski
Eversheds Sutherland (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 05/12 3:22 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulated discovery protocol, Dkt.26 , is ACCEPTED and entered as the court's own order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 5/12/25. (jat)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 05/12 3:20 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulated motion for protective order, Dkt.25 , is GRANTED with the following modifications: Paragraph 12 is modified by adding "pursuant to the provisions of Administrative Order No. 337" to the end of the last sentence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 5/12/25. (jat)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Discovery Mon 05/12 11:51 AM
Stipulated Motion for Discovery Protocol Governing Electronically Stored Information by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Protective Order Mon 05/12 11:47 AM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
utility Set/Reset Continuing Jury Trial Mon 04/07 9:32 AM
Disregard. Entered in the wrong case. Modified on 4/7/2025 (jls)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/04 4:30 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 4:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Donald Tomlinson for Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 10:24 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Clara Glen Ilkka for Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Ilkka, Clara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
21 21 order Pretrial Conference Order Thu 04/03 11:12 AM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/2/2025. Dispositive Motions due 2/5/2026. Settlement Letters due 6/19/2026. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 6/26/2026. Responses due 7/10/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2026 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2026 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/3/2026 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 4/2/25. (jat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Wed 04/02 4:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2025 [00:40] (ckl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Verified Complaint) against Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC, filed by Kason Industries, Inc.. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Kason Trademarks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- July 29, 2024 Hackney E-mail,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- August 28, 2024 Holdrich E-mail,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Non-Disclosure Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Nor-Lake NSF Search Results,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- Master-Bilt NSF Search Results,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- Nor-Lake Miami-Dade Notice of Acceptance
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Stipulation Tue 04/01 10:18 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulation to amend complaint (dkt. #17 ) is GRANTED, and defendants' motion for partial dismissal (dkt. #13 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/1/25. (jat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 misc Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report Wed 03/26 4:25 PM
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation Fri 03/21 9:37 AM
Stipulation to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc.. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Second Amended Verified Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1- Kason Trademarks,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- July 29, 2024 Hackney E-mail,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3- August 28, 2024 Holdrich E-mail,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4- Non-Disclosure Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5- Nor-Lake NSF Search Results,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6- Master-Bilt NSF Search Results,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7- Nor-Lake Miami-Dade Notice of Acceptance
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald Zdrojeski for Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc.. (Zdrojeski, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 9:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 7:51 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting11 Motion to Admit Samuel Clinton Merritt Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 3/7/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
misc Action Requested Fri 03/07 7:53 AM
Action Requested: This court's Electronic Filing Procedure V.I. states in part: Each defendant shall file a corporate disclosure statement with its first appearance in a lawsuit. Defendants'[LINK:Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Citizenship] is due. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/07 8:10 AM
Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Fri 03/07 9:00 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] [[LINK:Procedures for Requesting a Hearing to Resolve a Deposition Dispute] attached] (jat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 03/06 4:05 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Claim Under the Wisconsin Deceptive Trade Practices Act, Wis. Stat. § 100.18 by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. Brief in Opposition due 3/27/2025. Brief in Reply due 4/7/2025. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 4:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John C. Scheller for Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Scheller, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Admit Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 12:33 PM
Motion to Admit Samuel Clinton Merritt Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3574554.) by Defendants Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC. (Merritt, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Thu 02/13 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc. as to9 Amended Complaint,,. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/12 6:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Verified Complaint) against Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC, filed by Kason Industries, Inc.. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Kason Trademarks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- July 29, 2024 Hackney E-mail,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- August 28, 2024 Holdrich E-mail,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Non-Disclosure Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Nor-Lake NSF Search Results,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- Master-Bilt NSF Search Results,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- Nor-Lake Miami-Dade Notice of Acceptance
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 5:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Anna Carr Halsey for Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc.. (Halsey, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/24 2:01 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Nor-Lake, Incorporated served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/24 1:55 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Master-Bilt Products, LLC served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/24 1:55 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
misc Action Requested Tue 01/07 2:32 PM
Second Action Request: Plaintiff is requested to promptly file proof of service of the complaint. (jat)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
misc Action Requested Mon 12/16 3:20 PM
Action Requested: Plaintiff is requested to file proof of service of the complaint. (jat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/31 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jef)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action Thu 10/31 9:43 AM
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Thu 10/31 9:26 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Thu 10/31 9:27 AM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (jef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 4:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kason Industries, Inc.. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 59 pgs cmp Complaint - Patent or Trademark Wed 10/30 4:47 PM
TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Master-Bilt Products, LLC, Nor-Lake, Incorporated, Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3513918.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 2,176,043, issued 7/28/98, held by Kason Industries, Inc. ; Trademark # 2,382,322, issued 09/05/00, held by Kason Industries, Inc. ; Trademark # 2,415,070, issued 12/26/00, held by Kason Industries, Inc. ; Trademark # 2,415,066, issued 12/26/00, held by Kason Industries, Inc. ; Trademark # 4,906,918, issued 03/01/16, held by Kason Industries, Inc.;, filed by Kason Industries, Inc.. (Duchemin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Kason Trademarks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Non-Disclosure Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Nor-Lake NSF Search Results,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Master-Bilt NSF Search Results,
Att: 5 Summons- Refrigerated Solutions Group LLC,
Att: 6 Summons- Master-Bilt Products, LLC,
Att: 7 Summons- Nor-Lake Incorporated,
Att: 8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action